EP1220587 - Process for contemporaneous manufacture and interconnection between adjoining wiring boards [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.05.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.05.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.07.2005 [2005/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square - 20 A, 100 Clinton Avenue South Rochester New York 14644 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/27] | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Patent Department, Xerox Square - 20 A, 100 Clinton Avenue South Rochester, New York 14644 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Reijnders, Harry j M. Laurahof 2 5801 JE Venray / NL | [2002/27] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/27] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01130439.1 | 20.12.2001 | [2002/27] | Priority number, date | US20000746774 | 21.12.2000 Original published format: US 746774 | [2002/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1220587 | Date: | 03.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1220587 | Date: | 14.04.2004 | [2004/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H05K3/00, H05K3/36 | [2004/15] | CPC: |
H05K1/148 (EP,US);
H05K3/0052 (EP,US);
H05K2201/09036 (EP,US);
H05K2201/0909 (EP,US);
H05K2201/10287 (EP,US);
H05K2203/0195 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2002/27] | H05K3/36, H05K3/00 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2005/01] |
Former [2002/27] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur gleichzeitigen Herstellung und Verbindung von angrenzenden Leiterplatten | [2002/27] | English: | Process for contemporaneous manufacture and interconnection between adjoining wiring boards | [2002/27] | French: | Procédé de fabrication et d'interconnection simultanée de panneaux à circuit adjacents | [2002/27] | Examination procedure | 15.10.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/27] | 08.02.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2005/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 22.11.2004 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.11.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 22.11.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 22.11.2004 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2004 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4227238 (SAITO MASASHI) [X] 1-3,5,7,9,10 * column 6, line 31 - column 9, line 6; figures 7-15 * [Y] 6; | [AY]GB840762 (EMI LTD) [A] 1,10 * page 2, line 119 - page 3, line 22; figure - * [Y] 6; | [X]US4335272 (PITTENGER DANIEL I) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,9,10 * the whole document *; | [X]JPH10224007 ; | [X]JPH10224006 ; | [X]GB2061623 (TEKTRONIX INC) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,9,10 * the whole document *; | [X]DE3743163 (OLYMPIA AEG [DE]) [X] 1,2,5,7,9,10 * the whole document * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981130), vol. 1998, no. 13, & JP10224007 A 19980821 (AIWA CO LTD) [X] 1-3,5,7,9,10 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981130), vol. 1998, no. 13, & JP10224006 A 19980821 (AIWA CO LTD) [X] 1,2,5-10 * abstract * |