EP1108914 - Ratchet one-way clutch assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.01.2006 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 10.09.2008 [2008/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BorgWarner, Inc. 3850 Hamlin Road Auburn Hills, MI 48326-2872 / US | [2008/37] |
Former [2005/21] | For all designated states BorgWarner Inc. 3850 Hamlin Road Auburn Hills, MI 48326-2872 / US | ||
Former [2005/15] | For all designated states BorgWarner Inc. Powertrain Technical Center 3800 Automation Avenue, Suite 100 Auburn Hills, MI 48326-1782 / US | ||
Former [2001/25] | For all designated states BorgWarner Inc. 3001 West Big Beaver Road, Suite 200 Troy, Michigan 48007-5060 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Costin, Daniel P. 2329 Hartford Court Naperville, IL 60565 / US | 02 /
Bacon, Duane A. 269 Theiss Road, Vinton Ohio 45686 / US | [2001/34] |
Former [2001/25] | 01 /
Costin, Daniel P. 2329 Hartford Court Naperville, IL 60565 / US | ||
02 /
Bacon, Duane A. 374 Hollywood Drive Saline, MI 48176 / US | Representative(s) | Lerwill, John, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 10 Old Bailey London EC4M 7NG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/25] | Lerwill, John, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London, WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 01200306.7 | 02.09.1997 | [2001/25] | Priority number, date | US19960707104 | 03.09.1996 Original published format: US 707104 | US19970917880 | 27.08.1997 Original published format: US 917880 | [2001/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1108914 | Date: | 20.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1108914 | Date: | 02.01.2002 | [2002/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1108914 | Date: | 16.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F16D41/12 | [2001/25] | CPC: |
F16D41/12 (EP,US);
F16H2041/246 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/25] | Title | German: | Klinkeneinwegkupplungsanordnung | [2001/25] | English: | Ratchet one-way clutch assembly | [2001/25] | French: | Embrayage à roue libre à crochets | [2001/25] | Examination procedure | 21.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/14] | 19.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.01.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 05.01.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP97939741.1 / EP0923680 | Opposition(s) | 19.12.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]EP0471349 (FICHTEL & SACHS AG [DE]) [DX] 1,6,7 * column 8, line 27 - column 8, line 56; figures 5-7 *; | [A]US5064037 (LONG JR THOMAS F [US]) [A] 1-3 * column 4, line 63 - column 5, line 6 * * figures 14-16 *; | [A]US1883966 (KRAUSE FRANK R) [A] 4,5 * page 2, line 95 - line 109 * * figures 1,2 * | by applicant | US2226247 | US3554340 | US5449057 | GB190602116 | EP0471349 | DE375047 |