EP1107294 - Method for making diaphragm-based sensors and apparatus constructed therewith [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.01.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONEYWELL INC. Honeywell Plaza Minneapolis, MN 55408 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/24] | For all designated states HONEYWELL INC. Honeywell Plaza Minneapolis Minnesota 55408 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mirza, Amir R. 2125 Aquila Avenue Golden Valley, Minnesota 55427 / US | 02 /
Stratton, Thomas G. 3000 Sany Hook Drive Roseville, Minnesota 55113 / US | 03 /
Saathoff, Diedrich J. 205 Woodland Drive Burnsville, Minnesota 55337 / US | 04 /
Carney, James K. 7310 Paulsen Drive Eden Prairie, Minnesota 55346 / US | 05 /
Hocker, Benjamin G. 5730 Covington Circle Minnetonka, Minnesota 55345 / US | 06 /
Burns, David W. 5537 1st Avenue South Minneapolis, Minnesota 55419 / US | 07 /
Ikinwande, Akintunde 9968 Nord Road Minneapolis, Minnesota 55437 / US | 08 /
Horning, Robert D 4 Oak Shore Drive Burnsville, Minnesota 55337 / US | [2001/24] | Representative(s) | Fox-Male, Nicholas Vincent Humbert, et al Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Fox-Male, Nicholas Vincent Humbert, et al Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | ||
Former [2001/24] | Fox-Male, Nicholas Vincent Humbert, et al Eric Potter Clarkson Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 01200467.7 | 06.02.1992 | [2001/24] | Priority number, date | US19910652148 | 07.02.1991 Original published format: US 652148 | [2001/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1107294 | Date: | 13.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1107294 | Date: | 14.11.2001 | [2001/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.09.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G01L9/02, G01L9/06, G01L9/00, H01L21/18, H01L21/20 | [2001/28] | CPC: |
B81C1/00182 (EP,US);
G01L9/0042 (EP,US);
G01L9/0073 (EP,US);
H01L21/2007 (EP,US);
B81B2201/0292 (EP,US);
B81B2203/0127 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/24] | H01L21/18, H01L21/20, G01L9/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2001/24] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Diaphragma-Sensoren und somit hergestellte Vorrichtung | [2001/24] | English: | Method for making diaphragm-based sensors and apparatus constructed therewith | [2001/24] | French: | Procédé de fabrication de capteurs à base de diaphragmes et appareillage ainsi construit | [2001/24] | Examination procedure | 22.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/24] | 28.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 01.09.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/09] | 10.10.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/09] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP92300996.3 / EP0500234 | EP96115964.7 / EP0756164 | Request for further processing for: | 21.08.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 23.08.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request deemed not to be filed | 13.09.2002 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 04.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 06.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 04.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 04.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2006 | 15   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0261972 (UNIV LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR [US]) [A] 8-10 * column 24, line 50 - line 65; figures 29-32 *; | [A] - PETERSEN K ET AL, "SILICON FUSION BONDING: REVOLUTIONARY NEW TOOL FOR SILICON SENSORS AND MICROSTRUCTURES", WESCON TECHNICAL PAPERS, (19891101), vol. 33, pages 220 - 224, XP000116008 [A] 1-12 * page 220 - page 222; figures 2,3 * | [A] - C.L. COHEN, "simple wafer fusion builds better power chips", ELECTRONICS., VNU BUSINESS PUBLICATIONS, NEW YORK., US, (198512), vol. 58, no. 51, ISSN 0883-4989, pages 20 - 21, XP000820534 [A] 1-7,12 * the whole document * | [A] - BENGTSSON S ET AL, "INTERFACE CHARGE CONTROL OF DIRECTLY BONDED SILICON STRUCTURES", JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS,US,AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS. NEW YORK, (19890801), vol. 66, no. 3, ISSN 0021-8979, pages 1231 - 1239, XP000039852 [A] 1-7,12 * page 1234, column L, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.343469 | [A] - BENGTSSON S ET AL, "LOW-TEMPERATURE PREPARATION OF SILICON/SILICON INTERFACES BY THE SILICON-TO-SILICON DIRECT BONDING METHOD", JOURNAL OF THE ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY,US,ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY. MANCHESTER, NEW HAMPSHIRE, (19900701), vol. 137, no. 7, ISSN 0013-4651, pages 2297 - 2303, XP000138086 [A] 1-7,11 * page 2297, column L, paragraph 1 - column R, paragraph 2 * * page 2299, column R, paragraph 1 * | [A] - MASZARA W P ET AL, "BONDING OF SILICON WAFERS FOR SILICON-ON-INSULATOR", JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS,AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS. NEW YORK,US, (19881115), vol. 64, no. 10, PART 1, ISSN 0021-8979, pages 4943 - 4950, XP000050002 [A] 7 * page 4946, column L, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.342443 | [PA] - QUENZER H J ET AL, "LOW-TEMPERATURE SILICON WAFER BONDING", SENSORS AND ACTUATORS A,CH,ELSEVIER SEQUOIA S.A., LAUSANNE, (19920401), vol. A32, no. 1 / 03, ISSN 0924-4247, pages 340 - 344, XP000287353 [PA] 8-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0924-4247(92)80009-R | [DA] - MASAYOSHI ESASHI ET AL, "LOW-TEMPERATURE SILICON-TO-SILICON ANODIC BONDING WITH INTERMEDIATE LOW MELTING POINT GLASS", SENSORS AND ACTUATORS A,CH,ELSEVIER SEQUOIA S.A., LAUSANNE, (19900401), vol. A23, no. 1 / 03, ISSN 0924-4247, pages 931 - 934, XP000355796 [DA] 8-10 * the whole document * |