EP1130541 - Data storage and retrieval playback apparatus for a still image receiver [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 23.09.2016 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2016 | Refusal of application | published on 26.10.2016 [2016/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intellectual Ventures Fund 83 LLC 7251 W Lake Mead Boulevard Suite 300 Las Vegas, NV 89128 / US | [2013/18] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US | ||
Former [2001/36] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tutt, Lee W., Eastman Kodak Company Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | 02 /
Spurr, Robert W., Eastman Kodak Company Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | [2001/36] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/18] | Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | ||
Former [2013/13] | Small, Gary James, et al Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | ||
Former [2009/09] | Weber, Etienne Nicolas, et al Kodak Etablissement de Chalon Campus Industriel - Département Brevets Route de Demigny - Z.I. Nord - B.P. 21 71102 Chalon sur Saône Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2002/49] | Haile, Helen Cynthia, et al Kodak Limited Patent, W92-3A, Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | ||
Former [2002/16] | Nunney, Ronald Frederick Adolphe, et al Kodak Limited (W92) Patents Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | ||
Former [2001/36] | Lewandowsky, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing. Kodak Aktiengesellschaft, Patentabteilung 70323 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 01200499.0 | 13.02.2001 | [2001/36] | Priority number, date | US20000511513 | 23.02.2000 Original published format: US 511513 | [2001/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1130541 | Date: | 05.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1130541 | Date: | 22.01.2003 | [2003/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G06K17/00, H04N1/32, G03B31/00 | [2003/04] | CPC: |
H04N1/00241 (EP,US);
G06K17/00 (EP,US);
H04N1/00127 (EP,US);
H04N1/32122 (EP,US);
H04N1/00204 (EP,US);
H04N1/00236 (EP,US);
H04N2201/0049 (EP,US);
H04N2201/0055 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3207 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3226 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3261 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3274 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3278 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2001/36] | G06K17/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/50] |
Former [2003/41] | DE, FR | ||
Former [2001/36] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Datenspeicherungssystem und Vorrichtung zur Wiedergabe für einen Standbildempfänger | [2001/36] | English: | Data storage and retrieval playback apparatus for a still image receiver | [2001/36] | French: | Système de stockage de données et appareil de reproduction pour un récepteur d'image fice | [2001/36] | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/36] | 20.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2016 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 26.05.2016 | 26.05.2016 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 03.06.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2016/43] | 13.06.2016 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2016/43] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.10.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 09.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 08.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 08.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 07.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 07.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 07.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 13.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 05.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 27.08.2003 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   04.09.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH0644265 ; | [DA]US4983996 (KINOSHITA SATOSHI [JP]) [DA] 1* the whole document *; | [DA]US5313235 (INOUE MANABU [JP], et al) [DA] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0727696 (AGFA GEVAERT NV [BE]) [X] 1,2,4,6-8,12,13 * page 1, line 9 - page 4, line 23 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940526), vol. 018, no. 278, Database accession no. (P - 1743), & JP06044265 A 19940218 (NIPPON AVIONICS CO LTD) [X] 1,2,8 * abstract * | by applicant | JPH0644265 | US5528222 | US6008727 | - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940526), vol. 018, no. 278, page 1743 |