EP1129642 - Detachable support for a table top [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.11.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Ahrend N.V. Singel 130 1015 AE Amsterdam / NL | [2001/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Geerts, Gerardus Hendrikus Maria Lieseindsedijk 4 5482 ZJ Schijndel / NL | [2001/36] | Representative(s) | Lips, Hendrik Jan George HAAGSCH OCTROOIBUREAU Breitnerlaan 146 2596 HG Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2001/36] | Lips, Hendrik Jan George, Ir. HAAGSCH OCTROOIBUREAU Breitnerlaan 146 2596 HG Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 01200585.6 | 20.02.2001 | [2001/36] | Priority number, date | NL20001014445 | 21.02.2000 Original published format: NL 1014445 | [2001/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1129642 | Date: | 05.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1129642 | Date: | 19.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A47B13/02 | [2001/36] | CPC: |
A47B13/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/21] |
Former [2001/36] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Abnehmbarer Träger für eine Tischplatte | [2001/36] | English: | Detachable support for a table top | [2001/36] | French: | Support amovible pour un plateau de table | [2001/36] | Examination procedure | 21.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/14] | 06.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 28.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.11.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 05.11.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.10.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2003 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   24.04.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.01.2005 | CH | 19.01.2005 | FI | 19.01.2005 | IT | 19.01.2005 | LI | 19.01.2005 | TR | 19.01.2005 | CY | 20.02.2005 | IE | 21.02.2005 | MC | 28.02.2005 | DK | 19.04.2005 | GR | 19.04.2005 | SE | 19.04.2005 | PT | 19.06.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/36] | AT | 19.01.2005 | |
CH | 19.01.2005 | ||
FI | 19.01.2005 | ||
IT | 19.01.2005 | ||
LI | 19.01.2005 | ||
TR | 19.01.2005 | ||
CY | 20.02.2005 | ||
IE | 21.02.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2005 | ||
DK | 19.04.2005 | ||
GR | 19.04.2005 | ||
SE | 19.04.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | AT | 19.01.2005 | |
CH | 19.01.2005 | ||
FI | 19.01.2005 | ||
LI | 19.01.2005 | ||
TR | 19.01.2005 | ||
CY | 20.02.2005 | ||
IE | 21.02.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2005 | ||
DK | 19.04.2005 | ||
GR | 19.04.2005 | ||
SE | 19.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/51] | AT | 19.01.2005 | |
CH | 19.01.2005 | ||
FI | 19.01.2005 | ||
LI | 19.01.2005 | ||
TR | 19.01.2005 | ||
IE | 21.02.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2005 | ||
DK | 19.04.2005 | ||
GR | 19.04.2005 | ||
SE | 19.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/23] | AT | 19.01.2005 | |
CH | 19.01.2005 | ||
FI | 19.01.2005 | ||
LI | 19.01.2005 | ||
IE | 21.02.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2005 | ||
DK | 19.04.2005 | ||
GR | 19.04.2005 | ||
SE | 19.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 19.01.2005 | |
CH | 19.01.2005 | ||
FI | 19.01.2005 | ||
LI | 19.01.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2005 | ||
DK | 19.04.2005 | ||
GR | 19.04.2005 | ||
SE | 19.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/12] | AT | 19.01.2005 | |
CH | 19.01.2005 | ||
FI | 19.01.2005 | ||
LI | 19.01.2005 | ||
DK | 19.04.2005 | ||
SE | 19.04.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | AT | 19.01.2005 | |
FI | 19.01.2005 | ||
SE | 19.04.2005 | ||
Former [2005/48] | FI | 19.01.2005 | |
SE | 19.04.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 19.01.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1102082 (GARCY CORP) [X] 1-3,5,8 * page 2, column 1, line 9 - page 3, column 2, line 94; figures 3-5 *; | [A]BE876573 (BASTIDE JACQUES) [A] 1* figures 9-14 *; | [XA]EP0847715 (LEONARDO SRL [IT]) [X] 1,2 * column 4, line 24 - line 57; figures 13,14 * [A] 4,7 |