EP1101593 - Electrically-operated injection molding machine and injection molding method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.2005 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.08.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 05.09.2007 [2007/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyo Machinery & Metal Co. Ltd. 523-1 Fukusato, Futami-cho Akashi-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | For all designated states SONY DISC TECHNOLOGY INC. 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome,Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/21] | For all designated states Toyo Machinery & Metal Co. Ltd. 523-1 Fukusato, Futami-cho Akashi-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | ||
For all designated states Sony Disc Technology Inc. 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome,Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Taniguchi, Yoshiya c/o Toyo Mach. & Metal Co.,Ltd., 523-1 Fukusato Futami-cho, Akashi-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 02 /
Hirayama, Nobuyuki, c/o Sony Disc Technology Inc. 7-35 Kitashinagawa, 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Hara, Yoshiaki, c/o Sony Music Entertainment Inc. 1-4, Ichigaya-Tamachi Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2004/10] |
Former [2001/21] | 01 /
Taniguchi, Yoshiya c/o Toyo Mach. & Metal Co.,Ltd., 523-1 Fukusato Futami-cho, Akasak-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | ||
02 /
Hirayama, Nobuyuki, c/o Sony Disc Technology Inc. 7-35 Kitashinagawa, 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | |||
03 /
Hara, Yoshiaki, c/o Sony Music Entertainment Inc. 1-4, Ichigaya-Tamachi Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo / JP | Representative(s) | Hillier, Peter, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/21] | Hillier, Peter, et al Reginald W. Barker & Co., Cliffords Inn, Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 01200721.7 | 02.07.1998 | [2001/21] | Priority number, date | JP19970197825 | 07.07.1997 Original published format: JP 19782597 | JP19970363684 | 15.12.1997 Original published format: JP 36368497 | JP19970369418 | 26.12.1997 Original published format: JP 36941897 | JP19980140614 | 06.05.1998 Original published format: JP 14061498 | [2001/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1101593 | Date: | 23.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1101593 | Date: | 20.03.2002 | [2002/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1101593 | Date: | 15.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B29C45/77, B29C45/40, B29C45/38, B29C45/56, B29C45/76 | [2001/21] | CPC: |
B29C45/4005 (EP,US);
B29C45/38 (EP,US);
B29C45/561 (EP,US);
B29C45/77 (EP,US);
B29C2045/4036 (EP,US);
B29C2045/5625 (EP,US);
B29C2045/565 (EP,US);
B29C2945/76006 (EP,US);
B29C2945/76013 (EP,US);
B29C2945/7613 (EP,US);
B29C2945/76224 (EP,US);
B29C2945/76227 (EP,US);
B29C2945/76254 (EP,US);
B29C2945/76264 (EP,US);
B29C2945/76307 (EP,US);
B29C2945/76381 (EP,US);
B29C2945/76391 (EP,US);
B29C2945/76454 (EP,US);
B29C2945/76494 (EP,US);
B29C2945/76551 (EP,US);
B29C2945/76555 (EP,US);
B29C2945/76568 (EP,US);
B29C2945/76595 (EP,US);
B29C2945/76665 (EP,US);
B29C2945/76702 (EP,US);
B29C2945/76735 (EP,US);
B29C2945/76752 (EP,US);
B29C2945/76785 (EP,US);
B29C2945/76859 (EP,US);
B29C2945/76869 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [2001/21] | Title | German: | Elektrisch betätigte Spritzgiessmaschine und Spritzgiessverfahren | [2001/21] | English: | Electrically-operated injection molding machine and injection molding method | [2001/21] | French: | Machine à mouler par injection actionnée électriquement et procédé de moulage par injection | [2001/21] | Examination procedure | 06.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/21] | 12.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.08.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.04.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 08.04.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP98305280.4 / EP0890426 | Opposition(s) | 16.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 15.09.2004 | IT | 15.09.2004 | [2007/36] |
Former [2006/32] | FR | 15.09.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [PA]JPH09174622 ; | [A]CA1099065 (DU PONT CANADA) [A] 7,9 * page 5, line 26 - page 6, line 9; figure - *; | [A]EP0047387 (POLYGRAM GMBH [DE]) [A] 7,9* the whole document *; | [A]DD213294 (VEB KOMB. UMFORMTECHNIK ERFURT) [A] 1,4-6 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0348129 (KOJIMA HISASHI) [A] 7,9 * the whole document *; | [A]DE4410015 (SEIKO GIKEN KK [JP]) [A] 7,9 * column 9, line 36 - column 11, line 12; figures 1-3 *; | [AX] - MENGES G, "Neues Verfahren zur Maschinen- und Prozessüberwachung beim Spritzgiessen", KUNSTSTOFFE, CARL HANSER VERLAG. MUNCHEN, DE, (197910), vol. 69, no. 10, ISSN 0023-5563, pages 727 - 730, XP002098607 [A] 1,5,6 * the whole document * [X] 4 | [PA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971128), vol. 1997, no. 11, & JP09174622 A 19970708 (JAPAN STEEL WORKS LTD:THE) [PA] 3 * abstract * |