EP1134029 - Portable self-energizing pressure sprayer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.10.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.08.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 05.09.2007 [2007/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gilmour, Inc. 850 Library Avenue, Suite 204-D Newark, DE 19711 / US | [2001/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Leer, Rick L. 752 Briar Patch Road Somerset, PA 15501 / US | 02 /
Walker, Scott A. 307 West Race Street Somerset, PA 15501 / US | [2001/38] | Representative(s) | Möldner, Peter Robert Bosch GmbH Zentralabteilung Patente Postfach 30 02 20 D-70442 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/38] | Möldner, Peter Robert Bosch GmbH Zentralabteilung Patente Postfach 30 02 20 D-70442 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 01201168.0 | 13.03.2001 | [2001/38] | Priority number, date | US20000189194P | 14.03.2000 Original published format: US 189194 P | [2001/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1134029 | Date: | 19.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1134029 | Date: | 28.05.2003 | [2003/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1134029 | Date: | 15.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B05B9/04, B05B9/06, B05B9/08 | [2001/38] | CPC: |
B05B9/007 (EP,US);
B05B9/06 (EP,US);
B05B9/085 (EP,US);
B05B9/0877 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/08] |
Former [2001/38] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Portabler, selbstenergieerzeugender Druckzerstäuber | [2001/38] | English: | Portable self-energizing pressure sprayer | [2001/38] | French: | Pulvérisateur portable à pression s'auto-alimentant en énergie | [2001/38] | Examination procedure | 28.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/05] | 13.01.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.10.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 14.10.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 15.12.2004 | IT | 15.12.2004 | [2007/36] |
Former [2006/32] | FR | 15.12.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3807605 (MEHARRY J, et al) [A] 1,11,22,33 * abstract *; | [A]FR2213637 (EVRARD ETS [FR]) [A] 1,11,22,33 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2270949 (EVRARD ETS [FR]) [A] 1,11,22,33 * the whole document *; | [A]US3976231 (BETULIUS GILBERT E) [A] 1,11,22,33 * abstract *; | [A]US4240583 (HUGHES GARY W [US]) [A] 1,11,22,33 * abstract *; | [A]US4483486 (MAGDA ROBERT J [US]) [A] 1,11,22,33 * abstract *; | [A]US4807813 (COLEMAN LARRY [US]) [A] 1,11,22,33 * abstract *; | [A]US4936096 (VANDERJAGT JOHN A [US]) [A] 1,11,22,33* abstract *; | [X]WO9608317 (MIERS VICTOR VIVIAN [AU]) [X] 1-39 * abstract * * page 2, line 20 - page 3, line 25 * * page 4, line 21 - page 5, line 22 * |