EP1256619 - Lubricating oil composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.01.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.01.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.03.2004 [2004/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Infineum International Limited P.O. Box 1 Milton Hill Abingdon, Oxfordshire OX13 6BB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/46] | For all designated states Infineum International Limited P.O. Box 1, Milton Hill Abingdon, Oxfordshire OX13 6BB / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Locke, Christopher 27 Roman Way Wantage, Oxford OX12 9YF / GB | 02 /
Stevens, Mark 91 Main Street Metuchen, 08840 New Jersey / US | 03 /
Wrench, Peter 31 Glebe Gardens Grove Wantage, Oxford OX12 7LX / GB | [2002/46] | Representative(s) | Mansell, Keith Rodney, et al Infineum UK Ltd. Law Department P.O. Box 1 Milton Hill Abingdon, Oxfordshire OX13 6BB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/46] | Mansell, Keith Rodney, et al Infineum UK Ltd, Law Department, P.O. Box 1, Milton Hill Abingdon, Oxfordshire OX13 6BB / GB | Application number, filing date | 01201752.1 | 11.05.2001 | [2002/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1256619 | Date: | 13.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C10M163/00, C10M165/00, C10M167/00, // (C10N10/02, 10:04, 30:06, 40:26) | [2002/46] | CPC: |
C10M129/10 (EP);
C10M129/54 (EP);
C10M135/30 (EP);
C10M141/02 (EP);
C10M141/08 (EP);
C10M159/20 (EP);
C10M159/22 (EP);
C10M163/00 (EP);
C10M165/00 (EP);
C10M167/00 (EP);
C10M169/042 (EP);
C10M169/048 (EP);
C10M2205/00 (EP);
C10M2207/026 (EP);
C10M2207/027 (EP);
C10M2207/028 (EP);
C10M2207/141 (EP);
C10M2207/26 (EP);
C10M2207/262 (EP);
C10M2215/064 (EP);
C10M2215/066 (EP);
C10M2215/28 (EP);
C10M2219/044 (EP);
C10M2219/046 (EP);
C10M2219/068 (EP);
C10M2219/087 (EP);
C10M2219/088 (EP);
C10M2219/089 (EP);
C10M2223/045 (EP);
C10N2010/04 (EP);
C10N2030/02 (EP);
C10N2030/04 (EP);
C10N2030/06 (EP);
C10N2030/08 (EP);
C10N2030/10 (EP);
C10N2030/12 (EP);
C10N2030/18 (EP);
C10N2030/42 (EP);
C10N2030/43 (EP);
C10N2030/52 (EP);
C10N2040/25 (EP);
C10N2040/252 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | [2003/31] |
Former [2002/46] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Schmierölzusammensetzung | [2002/46] | English: | Lubricating oil composition | [2002/46] | French: | Composition d'huile lubrifiante | [2002/46] | Examination procedure | 14.05.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/11] | 10.09.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2004/11] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 23.06.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 23.06.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.06.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 23.06.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 23.06.2003 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.06.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 23.06.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 23.06.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 23.06.2003 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 23.06.2003 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 23.06.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 23.06.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.06.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 23.06.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 23.06.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 23.06.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 23.06.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 23.06.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.06.2003 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 23.06.2003 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2003 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0855437 (TONEN CORP [JP]) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * page 2, line 5 - page 2, line 10 * * page 2, line 38 - page 3, line 15 * * page 6, line 33 - page 6, line 44 * * page 8, line 35 - page 8, line 40 * * page 9, line 13 - page 9, line 17 * * page 9, line 33 - page 9, line 40 * * example 5 *; | [X]US6103672 (DUNN ADRIAN [GB], et al) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * column 1, line 3 - column 1, line 9 * * column 2, line 37 - column 2, line 46 * * column 19, line 5 - column 19, line 8 * * column 21, line 43 - column 21, line 45 * * column 22, line 21 - column 22, line 40 * * examples 12,13 * * claims 1,4,9,13,15 *; | [X]WO9637582 (EXXON RESEARCH ENGINEERING CO [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 3, paragraph 4 * * page 7, paragraphs 3,5 * * page 8, paragraphs 1-3 * * page 9, paragraph 3 * * examples 4,13-15 * * page 15, paragraph 2 * * claim 1 *; | [X]WO9428095 (EXXON RESEARCH ENGINEERING CO [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 3, paragraphs 2,3 * * page 5, paragraphs 3,4 * * examples 1,4,6,8 * * page 12, paragraphs 1,2 * * page 6, paragraph 1 * * page 7, paragraph 4 * |