EP1136494 - Method for preparation of stable water-borne silane compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.07.2005 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.09.2005 [2005/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Degussa Corporation 379 Interpace Parkway, P.O. Box 677 Parsippany, NJ 07054-0677 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/36] | For all designated states Degussa Corporation 379 Interpace Parkway, P.O. Box 677 Parsippany, NJ 07054-0677 / US | ||
Former [2001/47] | For all designated states Sivento Inc. 379 Interpace Parkway Builing C Parsippany New Jersey 07054 / US | ||
Former [2001/39] | For all designated states Sivento Inc. 65 Challenger Road Ridgfield Park NJ 07660 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Steinmetz, James R. 4344 Province Line Road Princeton, New Jersey / US | 02 /
Arkles, Barry C. 428 Blue Bird Lane Dresher, Pennsylvania / US | [2001/39] | Representative(s) | WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/39] | W.P. THOMPSON & CO. Eastcheap House Central Approach Letchworth, Hertfordshire SG6 3DS / GB | Application number, filing date | 01201939.4 | 31.03.1994 | [2001/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1136494 | Date: | 26.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1136494 | Date: | 19.12.2001 | [2001/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C08G77/14, C08G77/26, C08G77/30, C07F7/08 | [2001/51] | CPC: |
C08G77/14 (EP);
C07F7/0874 (EP);
C08G77/26 (EP);
C08G77/30 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2001/39] | C07F7/08, C08G77/14, C08G77/30, C08G77/26 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2001/39] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung stabiler wässriger Silan-Zusammensetzungen | [2001/39] | English: | Method for preparation of stable water-borne silane compositions | [2001/39] | French: | Procédé de préparation de compositions de silane aqueux stables | [2001/39] | Examination procedure | 25.06.2001 | Examination requested [2001/39] | 29.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.03.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/37] | 14.04.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/37] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP94302373.9 / EP0675128 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 09.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2004 | 11   M06   Fee paid on   30.09.2004 | 31.03.2005 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1100235 (DOW CORNING) [A] 1 * page 2, column 1, line 3 - line 19; claim 1 *; | [A]GB2108984 (GEN ELECTRIC) [A] 1 * claim 1 *; | [A]US5051129 (CUTHBERT ROBERT L [US], et al) [A] 1 * examples 1,2 *; | [D]US5073195 (CUTHBERT ROBERT L [US], et al) |