EP1143493 - Sublimation growth of silicon carbide crystals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.01.2010 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.01.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.02.2010 [2010/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NORTH CAROLINA STATE UNIVERSITY 103 Holladay Hall, Campus Box 7003 Raleigh North Carolina 27695-7003 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/41] | For all designated states NORTH CAROLINA STATE UNIVERSITY 103 Holladay Hall, Campus Box 7003 Raleigh, North Carolina 27695-7003 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Davis, Robert F. 5705 Carlton Drive Raleigh, NC 27612 / US | 02 /
Hunter, Charles Eric 24 Shell Ring Road Hilton Head Island, SC 29928 / US | 03 /
Carter, Calvin H. Jr. 114 North Drawbridge Lane Cary, North Carolina 27513 / US | [2002/15] |
Former [2001/41] | 01 /
Davis, Robert F. 809 Runnymede Road Raleigh, North Carolina 27607-3501 / US | ||
02 /
Hunter, Charles Eric 5639 Chapel Hill Road, Apartment 910 Durham, North Carolina 27707 / US | |||
03 /
Carter, Calvin H. Jr. 114 North Drawbridge Lane Cary, North Carolina 27513 / US | Representative(s) | Bankes, Stephen Charles Digby, et al Baron Warren Redfern 1000 Great West Road Brentford TW8 9DW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/41] | Bankes, Stephen Charles Digby, et al BARON & WARREN 18 South End Kensington London W8 5BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 01201980.8 | 26.10.1988 | [2001/41] | Priority number, date | US19870113565 | 26.10.1987 Original published format: US 113565 | [2001/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1143493 | Date: | 10.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1143493 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | [2004/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C30B23/00, C30B29/36 | [2004/01] | CPC: |
H01L33/0054 (EP,US);
H01L21/205 (KR);
C30B23/00 (EP,US);
C30B29/36 (EP,US);
Y10S148/021 (EP,US);
Y10S148/148 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/41] | H01L21/205 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [2001/41] | Title | German: | Sublimationsanwachse von Siliziumkarbidkristallen | [2001/41] | English: | Sublimation growth of silicon carbide crystals | [2001/41] | French: | Croissance de cristaux de carbure de silicium par sublimation | [2001/41] | Examination procedure | 15.06.2001 | Examination requested [2001/41] | 21.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.09.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/08] | 07.10.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/08] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP88910210.9 / EP0389533 | EP95202796.9 / EP0712150 | Request for further processing for: | 20.08.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 20.08.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.09.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 15.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 15.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 15.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 26.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 15.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 14.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 14.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 12.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 18 | 12.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 19 | 12.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 20 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS6266000 ; | [A]JPS5935099 ; | [A]DE3230727 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870828), vol. 011, no. 267, Database accession no. (C - 443), & JP62066000 A 19870325 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - KOGA K ET AL, "SINGLE CRYSTAL GROWTH OF 6H-SIC BY A VACUUM SUBLIMINATION METHOD", JAPANESE JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, PUBLICATION OFFICE JAPANESE JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS. TOKYO, JP, (19850825), ISSN 0021-4922, pages 249 - 252, XP000560483 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840608), vol. 008, no. 122, Database accession no. (C - 227), & JP59035099 A 19840225 (KOGYO GIJUTSUIN;OTHERS: 0J) [A] 1 * abstract * |