EP1162673 - Method of making an emissive layer for an organic light-emitting device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US | ||
Former [2006/11] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650 / US | ||
Former [2001/50] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Long, Michael Edgar Eastman Kodak Company, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | 02 /
Tang, Ching Wan Eastman Kodak Company, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | [2001/50] | Representative(s) | Weber, Etienne Nicolas, et al Kodak Boite n 2 Zone d'activité SAONEOR 12 rue Alfred Kastler 71530 Fragnes / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/37] | Weber, Etienne Nicolas, et al Kodak Industrie, Département Brevets, CRT, Zone Industrielle 71102 Chalon sur Saône Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2002/16] | Parent, Yves, et al KODAK INDUSTRIE, Département Brevets, CRT - Zone Industrielle 71102 Chalon-sur-Saône Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2001/50] | Lewandowsky, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing., et al Kodak Aktiengesellschaft, Patentabteilung 70323 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 01201999.8 | 28.05.2001 | [2001/50] | Priority number, date | US20000590043 | 08.06.2000 Original published format: US 590043 | [2001/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1162673 | Date: | 12.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1162673 | Date: | 04.02.2004 | [2004/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1162673 | Date: | 15.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H01L51/50, H01L51/56 | [2006/10] | CPC: |
H10K50/11 (EP,KR,US);
H10K85/631 (EP,KR,US);
H10K85/324 (EP,KR,US);
H10K85/60 (EP,KR,US);
H10K85/615 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/50] | H01L51/20 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/44] |
Former [2001/50] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer emittierenden Schicht für eine organische lichtemittierende Vorrichtung | [2001/50] | English: | Method of making an emissive layer for an organic light-emitting device | [2001/50] | French: | Méthode de fabrication d'une couche émissive pour un dispositif organique émetteur de lumière | [2001/50] | Examination procedure | 10.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/37] | 10.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.11.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 15.11.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.12.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH03205786 ; | [XY]GB1461199 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRONICS CORP); | [A]EP0817539 (IBM [US]); | [A]EP0827366 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US], et al); | [Y]US5895692 (SHIRASAKI TOMOYUKI [JP], et al); | [A]WO9949525 (CAMBRIDGE DISPLAY TECH LTD [GB], et al); | [A]WO9953529 (UNIV PRINCETON [US], et al); |