EP1168060 - Lenticular image product presenting a flip image(S) where ghosting is minimized [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.03.2005 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US | ||
Former [2002/01] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gulick, Stephen, Jr. c/o Eastman Kodak Company Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | 02 /
Snider, David J. c/o Eastman Kodak Company Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | [2002/01] | Representative(s) | Weber, Etienne Nicolas, et al Kodak Boite n 2 Zone d'activité SAONEOR 12 rue Alfred Kastler 71530 Fragnes / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/37] | Weber, Etienne Nicolas, et al Kodak Industrie, Département Brevets, CRT, Zone Industrielle 71102 Chalon sur Saône Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2002/16] | Parent, Yves, et al KODAK INDUSTRIE, Département Brevets, CRT - Zone Industrielle 71102 Chalon-sur-Saône Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2002/01] | Lewandowsky, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing., et al Kodak Aktiengesellschaft, Patentabteilung 70323 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 01202346.1 | 18.06.2001 | [2002/01] | Priority number, date | US20000606701 | 29.06.2000 Original published format: US 606701 | [2002/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1168060 | Date: | 02.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G03B35/00, G03B35/24 | [2002/01] | CPC: |
G03B35/24 (EP);
H04N13/305 (EP,US);
G03B35/00 (EP);
H04N13/349 (EP,US);
H04N13/189 (EP);
H04N13/286 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2002/38] |
Former [2002/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Lentikulares Bild mit Flipbildern und minimalisierten Geisterbildern | [2002/01] | English: | Lenticular image product presenting a flip image(S) where ghosting is minimized | [2002/01] | French: | Limage lenticulaire présentant des images basculantes avec minimalisation d'images de dédoublement | [2002/01] | Examination procedure | 07.06.2002 | Examination requested [2002/32] | 03.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.10.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/16] | 17.11.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2004 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0887699 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [X] 1* column 4 - column 12; figures 1-16 * |