EP1271440 - High-voltage regulator with external control [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.10.2006 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EM Microelectronic-Marin SA Rue des Sors 3 2074 Marin / CH | [2005/48] |
Former [2003/01] | For all designated states EM Microelectronic-Marin SA Rue des Sors 3 2074 Marin / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Descombes, Arthur Mühlerain 29 3210 Kerzers / CH | [2003/01] | Representative(s) | Ravenel, Thierry Gérard Louis, et al ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Faubourg de l'Hôpital 3 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2003/01] | Ravenel, Thierry Gérard Louis, et al I C B, Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA, 7, rue des Sors 2074 Marin / CH | Application number, filing date | 01202429.5 | 25.06.2001 | [2003/01] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1271440 | Date: | 02.01.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1271440 | Date: | 30.11.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G08B17/10, G08B17/00, G01J1/42 | [2003/01] | CPC: |
G05F1/575 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/01] | Title | German: | Hochspannungsregler mit externer Steuerung | [2003/01] | English: | High-voltage regulator with external control | [2003/01] | French: | Régulateur haute-tension comprenant un dispositif externe de regulation | [2003/01] | Examination procedure | 02.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/36] | 05.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 30.09.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.11.2005 | CY | 30.11.2005 | FI | 30.11.2005 | IE | 30.11.2005 | IT | 30.11.2005 | NL | 30.11.2005 | TR | 30.11.2005 | DK | 28.02.2006 | GR | 28.02.2006 | SE | 28.02.2006 | ES | 13.03.2006 | PT | 02.05.2006 | LU | 25.06.2006 | BE | 30.06.2006 | MC | 30.06.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/37] | AT | 30.11.2005 | |
FI | 30.11.2005 | ||
IE | 30.11.2005 | ||
IT | 30.11.2005 | ||
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
TR | 30.11.2005 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
GR | 28.02.2006 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
ES | 13.03.2006 | ||
PT | 02.05.2006 | ||
LU | 25.06.2006 | ||
BE | 30.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/36] | AT | 30.11.2005 | |
FI | 30.11.2005 | ||
IE | 30.11.2005 | ||
IT | 30.11.2005 | ||
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
GR | 28.02.2006 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
ES | 13.03.2006 | ||
PT | 02.05.2006 | ||
BE | 30.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/28] | AT | 30.11.2005 | |
FI | 30.11.2005 | ||
IE | 30.11.2005 | ||
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
GR | 28.02.2006 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
ES | 13.03.2006 | ||
PT | 02.05.2006 | ||
BE | 30.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/07] | AT | 30.11.2005 | |
FI | 30.11.2005 | ||
IE | 30.11.2005 | ||
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
GR | 28.02.2006 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
ES | 13.03.2006 | ||
PT | 02.05.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | AT | 30.11.2005 | |
FI | 30.11.2005 | ||
IE | 30.11.2005 | ||
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
GR | 28.02.2006 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
ES | 13.03.2006 | ||
PT | 02.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/40] | AT | 30.11.2005 | |
FI | 30.11.2005 | ||
IE | 30.11.2005 | ||
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
GR | 28.02.2006 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
ES | 13.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/38] | AT | 30.11.2005 | |
FI | 30.11.2005 | ||
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
GR | 28.02.2006 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
ES | 13.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/34] | AT | 30.11.2005 | |
FI | 30.11.2005 | ||
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
ES | 13.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/33] | FI | 30.11.2005 | |
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
ES | 13.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/27] | FI | 30.11.2005 | |
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/23] | FI | 30.11.2005 | |
NL | 30.11.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS63217231 ; | [A]US3611335 (OGDEN WILBUR L, et al) [A] 1-10 * column 1, lines 5-55 * * column 4, line 56 - column 7, line 65; figures 2,3; claims 1-15 *; | [A]US3913082 (HAMM JEFFREY E) [A] 1-10 * column 1, line 5 - column 2, line 3 * * column 4, line 42 - column 6, line 31; figure 5; claims 1-8 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890111), vol. 013, no. 009, Database accession no. (P - 811), & JP63217231 A 19880909 (NOHMI BOSAI KOGYO CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * abstract * |