EP1160018 - Method and apparatus for fine particle formation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.03.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.03.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.04.2010 [2010/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sievers, Robert, E. 655 Northstar Court Boulder, Colorado 80304 / US | [2001/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sievers, Robert E. 655 Northstar Court Boulder, Colorado 80304 / US | 02 /
Karst, Uwe Dodo Strasse 13 48145 Munster / DE | [2001/51] | Representative(s) | Evens, Paul Jonathan, et al Maguire Boss 24 East Street St. Ives, Cambridgeshire PE27 5PD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/49] | Evens, Paul Jonathan, et al Maguire Boss, 5 Crown Street St. Ives, Cambridge PE27 5EB / GB | Application number, filing date | 01202801.5 | 29.03.1995 | [2001/49] | Priority number, date | US19940224764 | 08.04.1994 Original published format: US 224764 | [2001/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1160018 | Date: | 05.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1160018 | Date: | 09.01.2002 | [2002/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1160018 | Date: | 29.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B05D1/02, A61K9/16 | [2002/02] | CPC: |
A61K9/0073 (EP,US);
A61K9/0078 (EP,US);
A61K9/12 (EP,US);
A61K9/124 (EP,US);
A61K9/1688 (EP,US);
A61M15/00 (EP,US);
B01F23/043 (EP,US);
B01F23/09 (EP,US);
B01F23/30 (EP,US);
B01F23/32 (EP,US);
B01F23/39 (EP,US);
B01F25/20 (EP,US);
B01F25/281 (EP,US);
B01J2/04 (EP,US);
B01J3/008 (EP,US);
B05B12/1418 (EP,US);
B05B7/32 (EP,US);
B05D1/025 (EP,US);
A61K9/0075 (EP,US);
B01F2101/22 (EP,US);
B05D2401/90 (EP,US);
Y02P20/54 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2001/49] | B05D1/02 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [2001/49] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Erzeugung feiner Partikel | [2001/49] | English: | Method and apparatus for fine particle formation | [2001/49] | French: | Procédé et appareil de production de particules fines | [2001/49] | Examination procedure | 03.05.2002 | Observations by third parties | 01.07.2002 | Examination requested [2002/36] | 26.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.02.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 26.02.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP95302078.1 / EP0677332 | Opposition(s) | 01.02.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 03.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 22.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 28.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 25.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 19.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2003 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   03.04.2003 | 31.03.2008 | 14   M06   Fee paid on   25.04.2008 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0370268 (UNION CARBIDE CHEM PLASTIC [US]) [A] 1 * page 5, line 33 - page 19, line 28; figures 1,2 *; | [A]WO9317665 (SIEVERS ROBERT E [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US5043280 (FISCHER WILFRIED [DE], et al) [A] 1 * column 5, line 35 - column 6, line 16; figure 1 * | [A] - TOM, JEAN W.; DEBENEDETTI, PABLO G., "PARTICLE FORMATION WITH SUPERCRITICAL FLUIDS- A REVIEW", JOURNAL OF AEROSOL SCIENCE, ELMSFORD, NY, US, (1991), vol. 22, no. 5, XP000524006 [A] 1 * page 555 - page 575 * * page 577 - page 584 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0021-8502(91)90013-8 |