EP1156606 - An optical transmission system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.12.2004 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.12.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.02.2005 [2005/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/47] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kaede, Kazuhisa Nec Corp., 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Takano, Isamu Nec Corp., 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2001/47] | Representative(s) | WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/26] | W.P. THOMPSON & CO. Celcon House 289-293 High Holborn London WC1V 7HU / GB | ||
Former [2001/47] | Orchard, Oliver John JOHN ORCHARD & CO. Staple Inn Buildings North High Holborn London WC1V 7PZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 01202898.1 | 21.10.1992 | [2001/47] | Priority number, date | JP19910271615 | 21.10.1991 Original published format: JP 27161591 | JP19910271617 | 21.10.1991 Original published format: JP 27161791 | JP19910271619 | 21.10.1991 Original published format: JP 27161991 | [2001/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1156606 | Date: | 21.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1156606 | Date: | 04.02.2004 | [2004/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04B10/18 | [2001/47] | CPC: |
H04B10/25133 (EP,US);
H04B10/25137 (EP,US);
H04B10/299 (EP,US);
H04B2210/254 (EP,US);
H04B2210/258 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/44] |
Former [2001/47] | DE, FR, GB | Title | German: | Optisches Übertragungssystem | [2001/47] | English: | An optical transmission system | [2001/47] | French: | Système de transmission optique | [2001/47] | Examination procedure | 14.08.2001 | Examination requested [2001/47] | 01.05.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/06] | 10.09.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/06] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP92309601.0 / EP0539177 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 18.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 22.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2004 | 13   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS6043929 ; | [A]US4405199 (OGLE JAMES W [US], et al) [A] 1* abstract *; | [DA]EP0242802 (NEC CORP [JP]) [DA] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP0375253 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850713), vol. 009, no. 169, Database accession no. (E - 328), & JP60043929 A 19850308 (NIPPON DENKI KK) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - HENMI N ET AL, "Prechirp technique as a linear dispersion compensation for multi-gigabit long-span IM-DD optical transmission systems", COMMUNICATIONS - RISING TO THE HEIGHTS. DENVER, JUNE 23 - 26, 1991, PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS, NEW YORK, IEEE, US, (19910623), vol. 1, ISBN 0-7803-0006-8, pages 1222 - 1227, XP010044210 [A] 1 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICC.1991.162547 |