EP1183982 - Cleaning Pad [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.05.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lemmens, J.M.H. Swagemakersstraat 14 6372 BT Landgraaf / NL | For all designated states Geelen, A.L.G.M. Margrietlaan 29 6042 HT Roermond / NL | [2002/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Geelen, A.L.G.M. Margrietlaan 29 6042 HT, Roermond / NL | 02 /
Lemmens, J.M.H. Swagenmakersstraat 14 6372 BT, Landgraaf / NL | [2002/21] | Representative(s) | Bleukx, Lucas Lodewijk M. Bleukx Consultancy BVBA Derde Straat 7 3680 Maaseik / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Bleukx, Lucas Lodewijk M. Bleukx Consultancy BVBA Derde Straat 7 3680 Maaseik / BE | ||
Former [2002/10] | Bleukx, Lucas Lodewijk M. Hydro S.A. Avenue Marcel Thiry 83 1200 Bruxelles / BE | Application number, filing date | 01203313.0 | 03.09.2001 | [2002/10] | Priority number, date | NL20001016094 | 04.09.2000 Original published format: NL 1016094 | [2002/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1183982 | Date: | 06.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A47L13/16 | [2002/10] | CPC: |
A47L13/16 (EP);
G09F23/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2002/48] |
Former [2002/10] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Reinigungstuch | [2002/10] | English: | Cleaning Pad | [2002/10] | French: | Tampon de nettoyage | [2002/10] | Examination procedure | 07.03.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/25] | 15.01.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2003/25] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 18.10.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.10.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.10.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 18.10.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 18.10.2002 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.10.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 18.10.2002 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 18.10.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 18.10.2002 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 18.10.2002 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 18.10.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 18.10.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.10.2002 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.10.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 18.10.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 18.10.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 18.10.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.10.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.10.2002 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 18.10.2002 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5893190 (MERTZ GREGORY M [US]) [X] 1,2,4 * abstract * * column 4, line 10 - column 5, line 7 * * column 6, line 3 - line 10 * * figure - *; | [X]US5765233 (HAYES JEFFREY A [US]) [X] 1-3 * abstract * * column 1, line 29 - line 34 * * column 1, line 45 - column 2, line 3 * * figure - *; | [X]US6021550 (WELCH CHARLES D [US]) [X] 1,2,4 * column 3, line 53 - line 63 * * figure - *; | [X]DE19852492 (BREHM ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,4 * claim - * * figure - *; | [X]WO9963879 (MCKAY WILLIAM D [US]) [X] 1,3 * abstract * * page 4, line 11 - line 20 * * page 8, line 11 - line 15 * * page 8, line 29 - page 10, line 3 * * figures 1-3,11 *; | [AD]US6003190 (KNUDSEN CLIFFORD T [US]) [AD] 1 * abstract * * figure - *; | [A]DE3127860 (BOERNER JUERGEN) [A] * abstract * * page 4, paragraph 2 * * figure - * |