EP1193432 - Valve, in particular radiator valve [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2009 | Change - representative | published on 02.09.2009 [2009/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Danfoss A/S 6430 Nordborg / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2002/14] | For all designated states Danfoss A/S 6430 Nordborg / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Messmer, James David Noerre Allé 88 8000 Aarhus / DK | [2002/14] | Representative(s) | Knoblauch, Andreas, et al Patentanwälte Dr. Knoblauch PartGmbB Reuterweg 51-53 60323 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | Knoblauch, Andreas, et al Patentanwälte Dr. Knoblauch Schlosserstrasse 23 60322 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [2005/39] | Knoblauch, Andreas, et al Patentanwälte Dr. Knoblauch Schlosserstrasse 23 60322 Frankfurt/Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 01203474.0 | 14.09.2001 | [2002/14] | Priority number, date | DE2000148690 | 30.09.2000 Original published format: DE 10048690 | [2002/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1193432 | Date: | 03.04.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1193432 | Date: | 12.03.2003 | [2003/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1193432 | Date: | 24.05.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F16K11/20 | [2002/14] | CPC: |
F16K11/202 (EP);
F24D19/1018 (EP,US);
F16K1/52 (EP);
F16K27/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/14] | Title | German: | Ventil, insbesondere Heizkörperventil | [2002/14] | English: | Valve, in particular radiator valve | [2002/14] | French: | Soupape, en particulier soupape de radiateur | [2002/14] | Examination procedure | 04.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/23] | 17.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 22.03.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.02.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 24.05.2006 | FI | 24.05.2006 | IE | 24.05.2006 | NL | 24.05.2006 | DK | 24.08.2006 | SE | 24.08.2006 | GR | 25.08.2006 | AT | 14.09.2006 | LU | 14.09.2006 | BE | 30.09.2006 | CH | 30.09.2006 | LI | 30.09.2006 | MC | 30.09.2006 | PT | 24.10.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | FI | 24.05.2006 | |
IE | 24.05.2006 | ||
NL | 24.05.2006 | ||
DK | 24.08.2006 | ||
SE | 24.08.2006 | ||
GR | 25.08.2006 | ||
AT | 14.09.2006 | ||
LU | 14.09.2006 | ||
BE | 30.09.2006 | ||
CH | 30.09.2006 | ||
LI | 30.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
PT | 24.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/19] | FI | 24.05.2006 | |
IE | 24.05.2006 | ||
NL | 24.05.2006 | ||
DK | 24.08.2006 | ||
SE | 24.08.2006 | ||
GR | 25.08.2006 | ||
AT | 14.09.2006 | ||
BE | 30.09.2006 | ||
CH | 30.09.2006 | ||
LI | 30.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
PT | 24.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/50] | FI | 24.05.2006 | |
IE | 24.05.2006 | ||
NL | 24.05.2006 | ||
DK | 24.08.2006 | ||
SE | 24.08.2006 | ||
AT | 14.09.2006 | ||
BE | 30.09.2006 | ||
CH | 30.09.2006 | ||
LI | 30.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
PT | 24.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/45] | FI | 24.05.2006 | |
IE | 24.05.2006 | ||
NL | 24.05.2006 | ||
DK | 24.08.2006 | ||
SE | 24.08.2006 | ||
BE | 30.09.2006 | ||
CH | 30.09.2006 | ||
LI | 30.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
PT | 24.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/37] | FI | 24.05.2006 | |
IE | 24.05.2006 | ||
IT | 24.05.2006 | ||
NL | 24.05.2006 | ||
DK | 24.08.2006 | ||
SE | 24.08.2006 | ||
BE | 30.09.2006 | ||
CH | 30.09.2006 | ||
LI | 30.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
PT | 24.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/36] | FI | 24.05.2006 | |
IE | 24.05.2006 | ||
IT | 24.05.2006 | ||
NL | 24.05.2006 | ||
DK | 24.08.2006 | ||
SE | 24.08.2006 | ||
BE | 30.09.2006 | ||
PT | 24.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/31] | FI | 24.05.2006 | |
IE | 24.05.2006 | ||
NL | 24.05.2006 | ||
DK | 24.08.2006 | ||
SE | 24.08.2006 | ||
BE | 30.09.2006 | ||
PT | 24.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | FI | 24.05.2006 | |
IE | 24.05.2006 | ||
NL | 24.05.2006 | ||
DK | 24.08.2006 | ||
SE | 24.08.2006 | ||
PT | 24.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | FI | 24.05.2006 | |
IE | 24.05.2006 | ||
DK | 24.08.2006 | ||
SE | 24.08.2006 | ||
PT | 24.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/09] | FI | 24.05.2006 | |
DK | 24.08.2006 | ||
SE | 24.08.2006 | ||
Former [2006/51] | FI | 24.05.2006 | |
SE | 24.08.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | SE | 24.08.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE24398 (GEORG SEIDEMAN) [X] 1,2,4,6,9-11 * the whole document *; | [X]FR902355 (BONGERS ADRIAAN FRANS ALBERT) [X] 1,2,4-7,9-11 * page 2, line 26 - line 40 * * figures 3,4 *; | [X]DE1139707 (REGULATION AUTOMATIQUE S A R L) [X] 1,2,6,7,9-11 * column 1, line 41 - column 3, line 15 * * figure - *; | [A]DE19813307 (SCHUCK FRANZ GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-5 * column 3, line 25 - column 4, line 3 ** figures 2-4 * | by applicant | WO9922282 |