EP1197453 - Gluing unit of a tail end of a log [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 18.04.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.08.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 11.09.2013 [2013/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gambini, Giovanni Via A. Omodeo 7 56124 Pisa / IT | [2002/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2002/16] | Representative(s) | Zanardo, Giovanni Ing. Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo 10 20121 Milan / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2002/16] | Zanardo, Giovanni Ing. Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A., Via Borgonuovo 10 20121 Milan / IT | Application number, filing date | 01203625.7 | 25.09.2001 | [2002/16] | Priority number, date | IT2021MI00095 | 11.10.2000 Original published format: IT MI202195 | [2002/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1197453 | Date: | 17.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1197453 | Date: | 20.08.2003 | [2003/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1197453 | Date: | 23.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B65H19/29 | [2002/16] | CPC: |
B65H19/29 (EP,US);
B65H2301/414421 (EP,US);
B65H2301/41445 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1798 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/16] | Extension states | RO | 10.02.2004 | Title | German: | Klebevorrichtung für das Ende einer Rolle | [2002/16] | English: | Gluing unit of a tail end of a log | [2002/16] | French: | Dispositif de collage pour la fin d'un rouleau | [2002/16] | Examination procedure | 10.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/15] | 19.04.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.08.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 01.08.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
23.08.2006
01.09.2006
ADMISSIBLE Paper Converting Machine Company 2300 South Ashland Avenue Green Bay WI 54304 / US Opponent's representative Ruschke, Hans Edvard Ruschke Madgwick Seide & Kollegen Patentanwälte Patent Attorney (UK) PartG mbB Postfach 86 06 29 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/36] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
23.08.2006
01.09.2006
ADMISSIBLE Paper Converting Machine Company 2300 South Ashland Avenue Green Bay WI 54304 / US Opponent's representative Ruschke, Hans Edvard RUSCHKE HARTMANN MADGWICK & SEIDE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 29 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/40] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
23.08.2006
Paper Converting Machine Company 2300 South Ashland Avenue Green Bay WI 54304 / US Opponent's representative Ruschke, Hans Edvard RUSCHKE HARTMANN MADGWICK & SEIDE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 29 81633 München / DE | 27.09.2006 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 27.03.2007 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 13.12.2007 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2008/21] | 13.12.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.01.2008 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 02.01.2008 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.11.2005 | BE | 23.11.2005 | CH | 23.11.2005 | CY | 23.11.2005 | FI | 23.11.2005 | LI | 23.11.2005 | NL | 23.11.2005 | TR | 23.11.2005 | DK | 23.02.2006 | GR | 23.02.2006 | SE | 23.02.2006 | PT | 24.04.2006 | IE | 25.09.2006 | LU | 25.09.2006 | MC | 30.09.2006 | [2013/37] |
Former [2009/02] | AT | 23.11.2005 | |
BE | 23.11.2005 | ||
CH | 23.11.2005 | ||
CY | 23.11.2005 | ||
FI | 23.11.2005 | ||
LI | 23.11.2005 | ||
NL | 23.11.2005 | ||
TR | 23.11.2005 | ||
DK | 23.02.2006 | ||
GR | 23.02.2006 | ||
SE | 23.02.2006 | ||
PT | 24.04.2006 | ||
IE | 25.09.2006 | ||
LU | 25.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2008/37] | AT | 23.11.2005 | |
BE | 23.11.2005 | ||
CH | 23.11.2005 | ||
FI | 23.11.2005 | ||
LI | 23.11.2005 | ||
NL | 23.11.2005 | ||
TR | 23.11.2005 | ||
DK | 23.02.2006 | ||
GR | 23.02.2006 | ||
SE | 23.02.2006 | ||
PT | 24.04.2006 | ||
IE | 25.09.2006 | ||
LU | 25.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/45] | AT | 23.11.2005 | |
BE | 23.11.2005 | ||
CH | 23.11.2005 | ||
FI | 23.11.2005 | ||
LI | 23.11.2005 | ||
NL | 23.11.2005 | ||
DK | 23.02.2006 | ||
GR | 23.02.2006 | ||
SE | 23.02.2006 | ||
PT | 24.04.2006 | ||
IE | 25.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/42] | AT | 23.11.2005 | |
BE | 23.11.2005 | ||
CH | 23.11.2005 | ||
FI | 23.11.2005 | ||
IT | 23.11.2005 | ||
LI | 23.11.2005 | ||
NL | 23.11.2005 | ||
DK | 23.02.2006 | ||
GR | 23.02.2006 | ||
SE | 23.02.2006 | ||
PT | 24.04.2006 | ||
IE | 25.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/37] | AT | 23.11.2005 | |
BE | 23.11.2005 | ||
CH | 23.11.2005 | ||
FI | 23.11.2005 | ||
IT | 23.11.2005 | ||
LI | 23.11.2005 | ||
NL | 23.11.2005 | ||
DK | 23.02.2006 | ||
GR | 23.02.2006 | ||
SE | 23.02.2006 | ||
PT | 24.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/36] | AT | 23.11.2005 | |
BE | 23.11.2005 | ||
CH | 23.11.2005 | ||
FI | 23.11.2005 | ||
IT | 23.11.2005 | ||
LI | 23.11.2005 | ||
NL | 23.11.2005 | ||
DK | 23.02.2006 | ||
GR | 23.02.2006 | ||
SE | 23.02.2006 | ||
PT | 24.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | AT | 23.11.2005 | |
BE | 23.11.2005 | ||
CH | 23.11.2005 | ||
FI | 23.11.2005 | ||
LI | 23.11.2005 | ||
NL | 23.11.2005 | ||
DK | 23.02.2006 | ||
GR | 23.02.2006 | ||
SE | 23.02.2006 | ||
PT | 24.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/38] | AT | 23.11.2005 | |
BE | 23.11.2005 | ||
CH | 23.11.2005 | ||
FI | 23.11.2005 | ||
LI | 23.11.2005 | ||
NL | 23.11.2005 | ||
DK | 23.02.2006 | ||
GR | 23.02.2006 | ||
SE | 23.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | AT | 23.11.2005 | |
BE | 23.11.2005 | ||
CH | 23.11.2005 | ||
FI | 23.11.2005 | ||
LI | 23.11.2005 | ||
NL | 23.11.2005 | ||
DK | 23.02.2006 | ||
SE | 23.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/34] | AT | 23.11.2005 | |
CH | 23.11.2005 | ||
FI | 23.11.2005 | ||
LI | 23.11.2005 | ||
NL | 23.11.2005 | ||
DK | 23.02.2006 | ||
SE | 23.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/33] | CH | 23.11.2005 | |
FI | 23.11.2005 | ||
LI | 23.11.2005 | ||
NL | 23.11.2005 | ||
SE | 23.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/27] | FI | 23.11.2005 | |
NL | 23.11.2005 | ||
SE | 23.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/23] | FI | 23.11.2005 | |
NL | 23.11.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5681421 (BIAGIOTTI GUGLIELMO [IT]) [A] 1-5* the whole document * |