EP1304659 - Method and system and monitoring apparatus for access control of persons [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.06.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.06.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.07.2004 [2004/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke KPN N.V. Stationsplein 7 9726 AE Groningen / NL | [2003/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Roelofsen, Gerrit Rijndijk 60A 2331 AH Leiden / NL | 02 /
Gelbord, Boaz Simon Nieuwe Prinsengracht 80 1018 VV Amsterrdam / NL | [2003/17] | Representative(s) | Prins, Adrianus Willem V.O. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2003/17] | Prins, Adrianus Willem Vereenigde, Nieuwe Parklaan 97 2587 BN Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 01203970.7 | 22.10.2001 | [2003/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1304659 | Date: | 23.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G07C9/00 | [2003/17] | CPC: |
G07C9/257 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2004/03] |
Former [2003/17] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren, System und Kontrollvorrichtung zur Zugangskontrolle von Personen | [2003/17] | English: | Method and system and monitoring apparatus for access control of persons | [2003/17] | French: | Méthode, système et dispositif de contrôle pour contrôler l'accès de personnes | [2003/17] | Examination procedure | 24.10.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/30] | 19.02.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2004/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 02.12.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 02.12.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.12.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 02.12.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 02.12.2003 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.12.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 02.12.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 02.12.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 02.12.2003 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 02.12.2003 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 02.12.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 02.12.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.12.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 02.12.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 02.12.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 02.12.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 02.12.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 02.12.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.12.2003 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 02.12.2003 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0924655 (TRW INC [US]) [X] 1-22 * abstract * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0026] *; | [X]US4993068 (PIOSENKA GERALD V [US], et al) [X] 1-22 * abstract * * column 5, line 28 - line 51 *; | [A]US4821118 (LAFRENIERE ROGER F [US]) [A] 4,8,15,19,22 * abstract * * column 5, line 42 - line 44 *; | [A]US4805223 (DENYER PETER B [GB]) [A] 1-22 * abstract * * column 6, line 63 - column 7, line 55 *; | [A]WO9930267 (SOLTESZ JOHN A [US], et al) |