EP1213605 - Elongated radiography cassette [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.08.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US | ||
Former [2002/24] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Steklenski, David J., c/o Eastman Kodak Company Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | 02 /
Foos, David H., c/o Eastman Kodak Company Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | [2002/24] | Representative(s) | Weber, Etienne Nicolas, et al Kodak Boite n 2 Zone d'activité SAONEOR 12 rue Alfred Kastler 71530 Fragnes / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/37] | Weber, Etienne Nicolas, et al Kodak Industrie, Département Brevets, CRT, Zone Industrielle 71102 Chalon sur Saône Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2002/24] | Parent, Yves, et al KODAK INDUSTRIE, Département Brevets, CRT - Zone Industrielle 71102 Chalon-sur-Saône Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 01204469.9 | 22.11.2001 | [2002/24] | Priority number, date | US20000254119P | 08.12.2000 Original published format: US 254119 P | US20000742509 | 20.12.2000 Original published format: US 742509 | [2002/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1213605 | Date: | 12.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.04.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G03B42/04 | [2002/24] | CPC: |
G03B42/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/10] |
Former [2002/24] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Längliche Röntgenkassette | [2002/24] | English: | Elongated radiography cassette | [2002/24] | French: | Cassette radiographique oblongue | [2002/24] | Examination procedure | 15.11.2002 | Examination requested [2003/03] | 24.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2006 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2006/37] | 04.08.2006 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 11.10.2006 | 04.08.2006 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 11.10.2006 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US3774045 (TROTT R) [DA] 1-5 * figures 1,2; claim 1 *; | [A]US4546251 (SCHAFFER DERACE L [US]) [A] 1,2 * abstract *; | [DA]EP0919856 (AGFA GEVAERT NV [BE]) [DA] 1,2* figure 1; claims 1,2 * | Examination | EP0601355 | JP2000241920 | JP2000267210 |