EP1220336 - Separation method for Gallium Nitride devices on lattice-mismatch substrates [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.06.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.07.2009 [2009/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lumileds Lighting U.S., LLC 370 West Trimble Road San Jose California 95131 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/27] | For all designated states LumiLeds Lighting U.S., LLC 370 West Trimble Road San Jose, California 95131 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Imler, William R., Int. Octrooibureau B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2002/27] | Representative(s) | Dusseldorp, Jan Charles, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2002/27] | Dusseldorp, Jan Charles, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 01204726.2 | 06.12.2001 | [2002/27] | Priority number, date | US20000741972 | 20.12.2000 Original published format: US 741972 | [2002/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1220336 | Date: | 03.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1220336 | Date: | 01.08.2007 | [2007/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01L33/00, H01L21/78 | [2002/27] | CPC: |
H01L33/0095 (EP,US);
H01L21/78 (EP,US);
H01L33/32 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/31] |
Former [2008/15] | DE, GB | ||
Former [2002/27] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Trennverfahren für Vorrichtungen auf Galliumnitrid-Basis auf einem Substrat mit nicht angepasstem Gitter | [2002/27] | English: | Separation method for Gallium Nitride devices on lattice-mismatch substrates | [2002/27] | French: | Procédé de séparation des dispositifs en nitrure de gallium sur des substrats à défaut d'appariement | [2002/27] | Examination procedure | 01.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/13] | 02.02.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 11.03.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 11.03.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) FR | 03.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/31] | 19.02.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2000091636 (ROHM CO LTD) [X] 1-3,5-8,10-13,15-20 * abstract *; | [X]US6156584 (ITOH NORIKAZU [JP], et al) [X] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [PX]US6197609 (TSUTSUI TSUYOSHI [JP], et al) [PX] 1-3,5-8,10-13,15-20* the whole document * |