EP1219321 - Apparatus for radiation treatment with a homogeneous UVB distribution [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.11.2006 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.11.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.12.2006 [2006/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2006/02] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics, N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2002/27] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mewissen, Jan Alfons Catharina Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
Bernards, Thomas Nicolaas Maria Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2002/47] |
Former [2002/27] | 01 /
Mewissen, Jan alfons Catharina Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | ||
02 /
Bernards, Thomas Nicolaas Maria Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Representative(s) | Schouten, Marcus Maria NXP B.V. Intellectual Property & Licensing High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2002/27] | Schouten, Marcus Maria INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 01204831.0 | 11.12.2001 | [2002/27] | Priority number, date | EP20000204801 | 22.12.2000 Original published format: EP 00204801 | [2002/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1219321 | Date: | 03.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1219321 | Date: | 19.11.2003 | [2003/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1219321 | Date: | 11.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61N5/06 | [2002/27] | CPC: |
A61N5/0614 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [2004/33] |
Former [2002/27] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Apparat zur Strahlenbehandlung mit einer homogenen UVB-Verteilung | [2002/27] | English: | Apparatus for radiation treatment with a homogeneous UVB distribution | [2002/27] | French: | Appareil d'irradiation par rayonnement avec une répartition homogène d'UVB | [2002/27] | Examination procedure | 19.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/30] | 24.06.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.11.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 04.11.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.10.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2605487 (WOLFF FRIEDRICH) [A] 1 * figure 1; claim - *; | [A]EP0259507 (SCHNEIDER KARL) [A] 1* column 5, line 32 - line 37 *; | [A]DE3825535 (KRATZ JOSEF GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 60 - line 62 * * column 4, line 35 - line 36 *; | [A]DE19714234 (UWE UNTERWASSER ELECTRIC GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * column A * * column 1, line 21 - line 39 * * column 2, line 6 - line 34; claim - *; | [A]US6005254 (WIJTSMA JORRIT [NL], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 49 - column 3, line 7 * |