EP1223091 - Apparatus and method for preventing un-authorized starting of a vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.10.2003 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.10.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.12.2003 [2003/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Delphi Technologies, Inc. PO Box 5052 Troy, MI 48007 / US | [2002/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hazelton, Lawrence Dean 12017 Hill Road Goddrich, MI 48438 / US | 02 /
Hollis, Kenneth Brian 8171 Pine Ridge Drive Clarkson, MI 48346 / US | [2002/29] | Representative(s) | Denton, Michael John Delphi France SAS Bât. le Raspail - ZAC Paris Nord 2 22, avenue des Nations CS 65059 Villepinte 95972 Roissy CDG Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/29] | Denton, Michael John Delphi Automotive Systems, Centre Technique Paris, 117, avenue des Nations, B.P. 60059 95972 Roissy Charles de Gaulle Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 01204976.3 | 18.12.2001 | [2002/29] | Priority number, date | US20010758807 | 11.01.2001 Original published format: US 758807 | [2002/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1223091 | Date: | 17.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B60R25/04 | [2002/29] | CPC: |
B60R25/24 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2003/15] |
Former [2002/29] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Gerät und Verfahren zum Verhindern des unauthorisierten Startens eines Kraftfahrzeuges | [2002/29] | English: | Apparatus and method for preventing un-authorized starting of a vehicle | [2002/29] | French: | Dispositif et méthode pour prévenir le démarrage sans autorisation d'un véhicule | [2002/29] | Examination procedure | 18.01.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/50] | 26.06.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2003/50] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 04.03.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.03.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.03.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 04.03.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 04.03.2003 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.03.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 04.03.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 04.03.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 04.03.2003 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 04.03.2003 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 04.03.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 04.03.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.03.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.03.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 04.03.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 04.03.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 04.03.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.03.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.03.2003 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 04.03.2003 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4110734 (LEPORE HENRY D, et al) [A] 1-21* abstract *; | [A]US4553127 (ISSA DARRELL E [US]) [A] 1-21 * column A; figures 1-8 *; | [XAY]DE4432539 (ZIELKE ALFRED [DE]) [X] 1-8 * column 4, line 43 - line 57; figure 1 * * column A * [A] 13-21 [Y] 9-12; | [A]US5576686 (WESTERMEIR GERHARD [DE], et al) [A] 1-21 * column 1, line 31 - line 34 * * column 2, line 65 - column 3, line 7 * * column 3, line 38 - line 44; figure 1 * * column A *; | [YA]EP1065112 (FORD GLOBAL TECH INC [US]) [Y] 9-12 * column 1, line 21 - line 29 * * column 2, line 35 - line 37 * * column 3, line 55 - column 4, line 23; figures 1-6 * * column A * [A] 1-8,13-21 |