EP1128688 - Method for personally targeted communication and information [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 19.03.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.2004 | Refusal of application | published on 06.05.2004 [2004/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vodafone Holding GmbH Mannesmannufer 2 40213 Düsseldorf / DE | [2003/24] |
Former [2002/18] | For all designated states Vodafone AG Mannesmannufer 2 40213 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2001/35] | For all designated states MANNESMANN Aktiengesellschaft Mannesmannufer 2 40213 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schröter, Andreas, Dipl.-Ing. Königsberger Strasse 11 40670 Meerbusch / DE | [2001/35] | Representative(s) | Meissner, Peter E., et al Meissner & Meissner Patentanwaltsbüro Hohenzollerndamm 89 14199 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/35] | Meissner, Peter E., Dipl.-Ing., et al Meissner & Meissner, Patentanwaltsbüro, Hohenzollerndamm 89 14199 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 01250007.0 | 08.01.2001 | [2001/35] | Priority number, date | DE2000109836 | 24.02.2000 Original published format: DE 10009836 | [2001/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1128688 | Date: | 29.08.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1128688 | Date: | 14.08.2002 | [2002/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/22 | [2001/35] | CPC: |
H04W4/029 (EP,US);
H04W4/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/19] |
Former [2001/35] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Personenbezogenes Kommunikations- und Informationsverfahren | [2001/35] | English: | Method for personally targeted communication and information | [2001/35] | French: | Procédé de communication et d'information individualisé | [2001/35] | Examination procedure | 26.11.2002 | Examination requested [2003/05] | 24.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.05.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2004/19] | 13.12.2003 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2004/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2004 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19640735 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-30 * abstract ** column 1, line 43 - column 6, line 56; figure 1 *; | [Y]DE19816575 (MANNESMANN AG [DE]) [Y] 1-30 * abstract * * column 1, line 12 - line 18 * * column 4, line 29 - line 51; figure 1 *; | [Y]DE19837568 (SCHORCHT GUNAR [DE], et al) [Y] 1-30 * abstract * * column 3, line 29 - line 32 * |