EP1239264 - System for setting the direction of a laser beam [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.03.2015 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha TOPCON 75-1, Hasunuma-cho Itabashi-ku Tokyo 174-0052 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2014/20] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha TOPCON 75-1, Hasunuma-cho, Itabashi-ku Tokyo 174-0052 / JP | ||
Former [2002/37] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha TOPCON 75-1, Hasunuma-cho, Itabashi-ku Tokyo 174-0052 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ohtomo, Fumio, c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Topcon 75-1, Hasunuma-cho, Itabashi-ku Tokyo 174-0052 / JP | 02 /
Hayashi, Kunihiro, c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Topcon 75-1, Hasunuma-cho, Itabashi-ku Tokyo 174-0052 / JP | 03 /
Hirano, Satoshi, c/o Topcon Laser Systems, Inc. 5758 W. Las Positas Blvd. Pleasenton, California 94588 / US | 04 /
O'Connor, Ray, c/o Topcon Laser Systems, Inc. 5758 W. Las Positas Blvd. Pleasenton, California 94588 / US | [2014/20] |
Former [2002/37] | 01 /
Ohtomo, Fumio, c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Topcon 75-1, Hasunuma-cho, Itabashi-ku Tokyo 174-0052 / JP | ||
02 /
Hayashi, Kunihiro, c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Topcon 75-1, Hasunuma-cho, Itabashi-ku Tokyo 174-0052 / JP | |||
03 /
Hirano, Satoshi, c/o Topcon Laser Systems, Inc. 5758 W. Las Positas Blvd. Pleasenton, California 94588 / US | |||
04 /
O'Connor, Ray, c/o Topcon Laser Systems, Inc. 5758 W. Las Positas Blvd. Pleasenton, California 94588 / US | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/20] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 13 80339 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/28] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 13 80339 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/37] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Mozartstrasse 17 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01250451.0 | 21.12.2001 | [2002/37] | Priority number, date | US20010802067 | 08.03.2001 Original published format: US 802067 | [2002/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1239264 | Date: | 11.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1239264 | Date: | 24.09.2003 | [2003/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1239264 | Date: | 14.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G01C15/00, G01S5/00, G01B11/26 | [2003/14] | CPC: |
G01C15/002 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/37] | G01C15/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/37] | Title | German: | Laserbündelausrichtungssystem | [2002/37] | English: | System for setting the direction of a laser beam | [2002/37] | French: | Système pour aligner un faisceau laser | [2002/37] | Examination procedure | 16.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/12] | 09.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.09.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.04.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 01.04.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.04.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP07075572.3 / EP1852675 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.11.2006 | Opposition(s) | 17.02.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 28.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 23.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.05.2014 | BE | 14.05.2014 | CY | 14.05.2014 | DK | 14.05.2014 | ES | 14.05.2014 | FI | 14.05.2014 | IT | 14.05.2014 | MC | 14.05.2014 | NL | 14.05.2014 | SE | 14.05.2014 | TR | 14.05.2014 | GR | 15.08.2014 | PT | 15.09.2014 | GB | 21.12.2014 | IE | 21.12.2014 | LU | 21.12.2014 | [2016/32] |
Former [2016/27] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
IT | 14.05.2014 | ||
MC | 14.05.2014 | ||
NL | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
GB | 21.12.2014 | ||
IE | 21.12.2014 | ||
LU | 21.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/48] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
IT | 14.05.2014 | ||
NL | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
GB | 21.12.2014 | ||
IE | 21.12.2014 | ||
LU | 21.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
IT | 14.05.2014 | ||
NL | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
IE | 21.12.2014 | ||
LU | 21.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
IT | 14.05.2014 | ||
NL | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
LU | 21.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
IT | 14.05.2014 | ||
NL | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
NL | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 14.05.2014 | |
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 14.05.2014 | |
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 14.05.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0481307 (ASAHI SEIMITSU KK [JP]) [A] 1-4 * column 1, line 3 - line 53 * * column 7, line 17 - column 10, line 54 * * abstract *; | [A]WO0007034 (GEOPOLAR OY [FI], et al) [A] 1-4* page 4, line 8 - line 27; figure 3 *; | [A]US6175328 (ERICSSON LARS [SE], et al) [A] 1-4 * column 2, line 27 - column 6, line 7; figure 1 * |