EP1349501 - DEVICES FOR SEALING OPENINGS THROUGH TISSUE AND APPARATUS FOR DELIVERING THEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.01.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ensure Medical, Inc. 762 San Aleso Avenue Sunnyvale, CA 94085 / US | [2005/26] |
Former [2003/41] | For all designated states Integrated Vascular Systems, Inc. 3259 Kifer Road Santa Clara, CA 95051 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GINN, Richard, S. 297 Marti Way San Jose, CA 95136 / US | 02 /
SALMON, Stephen, M. 1177 Hagen Road Napa, CA 94558 / US | 03 /
JABBA, Ronald, J. 144 Oakdale Street Redwood City, CA 94062 / US | [2003/41] | Representative(s) | McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/52] | McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2003/41] | McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 01270132.2 | 11.12.2001 | [2003/41] | WO2001US48843 | Priority number, date | US20000738431 | 14.12.2000 Original published format: US 738431 | US20010866548 | 25.05.2001 Original published format: US 866548 | US20010931676 | 15.08.2001 Original published format: US 931676 | [2003/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02062234 | Date: | 15.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/33] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1349501 | Date: | 08.10.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.08.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1349501 | Date: | 11.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/00 | [2003/41] | CPC: |
A61B17/0057 (EP,US);
A61B2010/0003 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00004 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00637 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00654 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00898 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNGEN ZUM ABDICHTEN EINER ÖFFNUNG DURCH GEWEBE UND GERÄT ZUM EINFÜHREN DIESER VORRICHTUNGEN | [2003/41] | English: | DEVICES FOR SEALING OPENINGS THROUGH TISSUE AND APPARATUS FOR DELIVERING THEM | [2003/41] | French: | DISPOSITIFS PERMETTANT D'OBTURER DES OUVERTURES PRATIQUEES DANS UN TISSU ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT D'ACHEMINER LESDITS DISPOSITIFS | [2003/41] | Entry into regional phase | 09.07.2003 | National basic fee paid | 09.07.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.07.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.07.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.07.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/41] | 15.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.09.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 23.09.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.12.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.03.2009 | CY | 11.03.2009 | DK | 11.03.2009 | FI | 11.03.2009 | TR | 11.03.2009 | SE | 11.06.2009 | GR | 12.06.2009 | PT | 24.08.2009 | LU | 11.12.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/21] | AT | 11.03.2009 | |
DK | 11.03.2009 | ||
FI | 11.03.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
GR | 12.06.2009 | ||
PT | 24.08.2009 | ||
LU | 11.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/47] | AT | 11.03.2009 | |
DK | 11.03.2009 | ||
FI | 11.03.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
GR | 12.06.2009 | ||
PT | 24.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | AT | 11.03.2009 | |
DK | 11.03.2009 | ||
FI | 11.03.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
PT | 24.08.2009 | ||
Former [2009/49] | AT | 11.03.2009 | |
FI | 11.03.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
PT | 24.08.2009 | ||
Former [2009/40] | AT | 11.03.2009 | |
FI | 11.03.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/37] | FI | 11.03.2009 | |
SE | 11.06.2009 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US5032125 (DURHAM A GLENN [US], et al) [X] 1,2,11,56 * column 3, line 66 - column 4, line 20; figure 5 * [Y] 18,19; | [A]US5061274 (KENSEY KENNETH [US]) [A] 37* column A; figures 5-8 *; | [Y]US5425757 (TIEFENBRUN JONATHAN [US], et al) [Y] 18,19 * column 4, line 62 - line 64; figure 11 *; | [A]US5571181 (LI SHU-TUNG [US]) [A] 1,18,37,56,61,69 * column 2, line 53 - line 64; figure 1 *; | [A]US5645565 (RUDD RAY G [US], et al) [A] 1,2,18,56,61,69 * column 3, line 16 - line 51; figure 1 *; | [A]US6016806 (WEBB NICHOLAS J [US]) [A] 1,2,18,56 * column A; figure 2 * |