EP1350987 - TOROIDAL TYPE CONTINUOUSLY VARIABLE TRANSMISSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.07.2010 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.08.2010 [2010/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | [2009/36] |
Former [2003/41] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKETSUNA, Yasuji, c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA K.K. 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | 02 /
TAMAKI, Shigenori, c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA K.K. 1, Toyota-cho Aichi 471-8571 / JP | [2009/36] |
Former [2003/41] | 01 /
TAKETSUNA, Yasuji, TOYOTA JIDOSHA K.K. 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | ||
02 /
TAMAKI, Shigenori, TOYOTA JIDOSHA K.K. 1, Toyota-cho Aichi 471-8571 / JP | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/34] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/41] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner, Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01270225.4 | 12.12.2001 | [2003/41] | WO2001JP10881 | Priority number, date | JP20000378899 | 13.12.2000 Original published format: JP 2000378899 | [2003/41] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0248578 | Date: | 20.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1350987 | Date: | 08.10.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.06.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1350987 | Date: | 02.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 20.06.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F16H15/38 | [2003/41] | CPC: |
F16H15/38 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE [2004/20] |
Former [2003/41] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | STUFENLOSES TOROIDGETRIEBE | [2003/41] | English: | TOROIDAL TYPE CONTINUOUSLY VARIABLE TRANSMISSION | [2003/41] | French: | TRANSMISSION VARIABLE EN CONTINU DU TYPE TOROIDAL | [2003/41] | Entry into regional phase | 12.06.2003 | Translation filed | 12.06.2003 | National basic fee paid | 12.06.2003 | Search fee paid | 12.06.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.06.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.04.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 12.06.2003 | Examination requested [2003/41] | 12.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.07.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 21.07.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2236589 (ROTAX LTD) [X] 1-3,7 * page 4, paragraph 2 * * page 6, paragraph 2 - page 7, paragraph 2 * * figures 1,2,4,7,11 *; | [X]DE19747694 (JATCO CORP [JP]) [X] 1,3,6 * column 3, lines 46-55 * * figures 1-3 *; | [X]DE2736553 (LUCAS INDUSTRIES LTD) [X] 1,5 * page 8, paragraph 2 * * figures 1,2 * | International search | [Y]JPH08135746 (NIPPON SEIKO KK); | [Y]JPH10132047 (JATCO CORP); | [Y]JPH04502954 |