EP1345505 - HELMET COMPRISING RETRACTABLE VISORS FOR FAST DAY/NIGHT RECONFIGURATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.09.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.08.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 05.09.2007 [2007/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thales 173, boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | [2003/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BATAILLE, Alexandre, Thales Intellectual Property 13, avenue du Président Salvador Allende 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | 02 /
MEYER, Guy, Thales Intellectual Property 13, avenue du Prés. Salvador Allende 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | [2003/39] | Representative(s) | Esselin, Sophie Marks & Clerk France Conseils en Propriété Industrielle Immeuble Visium 22 Avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/39] | Esselin, Sophie THALES Intellectual Property, 31-33 Avenue Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 01270258.5 | 11.12.2001 | [2003/39] | WO2001FR03925 | Priority number, date | FR20000016157 | 12.12.2000 Original published format: FR 0016157 | [2003/39] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0247503 | Date: | 20.06.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1345505 | Date: | 24.09.2003 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.06.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1345505 | Date: | 09.11.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A42B3/04, A42B3/22, A42B3/32 | [2003/39] | CPC: |
A42B3/228 (EP,US);
A42B3/042 (EP,US);
A42B3/32 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/22] |
Former [2003/39] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | HELM MIT ZURÜCKZIEHBAREN VISIEREN FÜR DIE SCHNELLE UMSTELLUNG ZWISCHEN TAG UND NACHT | [2003/39] | English: | HELMET COMPRISING RETRACTABLE VISORS FOR FAST DAY/NIGHT RECONFIGURATION | [2003/39] | French: | CASQUE A VISIERES ESCAMOTABLES A RECONFIGURATION RAPIDE JOUR/NUIT | [2003/39] | Entry into regional phase | 07.05.2003 | National basic fee paid | 07.05.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.05.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.06.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/39] | 23.05.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.08.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 24.08.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 09.11.2005 | [2007/36] | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2478960 (LANDI CESARE [IT]); | [A]EP0290293 (HELMETS LTD [GB]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE9409463U (SCHUBERTH WERK KG [DE]) [A] 1 * page 6, line 5 - line 27 * * page 8, lignes 1-2, 23-33 * * figures 1-3,7-10 *; | [A]FR2759869 (JCP IND [FR]); | [PXA]WO0189332 (GALLET SA [FR], et al) [PX] 1,7,8 * the whole document *[A] 2 |