EP1355613 - DEVICE FOR SPRAYING A COSMETIC PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 05.09.2008 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2008 | Revocation of patent | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'Oréal 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/23] | For all designated states L'ORÉAL 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2003/44] | For all designated states L'OREAL 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARA, Isabelle 58 bis, rue Saint Hilaire F-94210 La Varenne St. Hilaire / FR | [2003/46] |
Former [2003/44] | 01 /
BARA, Isabelle 57, rue de Tolbiac F-75013 Paris / FR | Representative(s) | Tanty, François, et al Nony 11 rue Saint-Georges 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/44] | Tanty, François, et al Nony & Associés, 3, rue de Penthièvre 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 01270302.1 | 22.11.2001 | [2003/44] | WO2001FR03689 | Priority number, date | FR20000016397 | 15.12.2000 Original published format: FR 0016397 | [2003/44] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0247618 | Date: | 20.06.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/25] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1355613 | Date: | 29.10.2003 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.06.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1355613 | Date: | 06.06.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61Q1/00, A61Q1/02, A61Q1/12, A61K8/19, A61K8/25, A61K8/29, A61K8/72, A61K8/89, A61K8/92, B05B7/24, B65D83/14 | [2006/51] | CPC: |
A61K8/046 (EP,US);
A45D34/04 (EP,US);
A61Q19/00 (EP,US);
B05B7/2421 (EP,US);
B05B7/2429 (EP,US);
B05B7/2472 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2003/44] | A61K7/00, B05B7/24, B65D83/14 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2004/21] |
Former [2003/44] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM ZERSTÄUBEN EINES KOSMETISCHEN PRODUKTES | [2003/44] | English: | DEVICE FOR SPRAYING A COSMETIC PRODUCT | [2003/44] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR LA PULVERISATION D'UN PRODUIT COSMETIQUE | [2003/44] | Entry into regional phase | 24.07.2002 | National basic fee paid | 24.07.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.07.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.07.2002 | Examination requested [2003/44] | 05.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.04.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 16.04.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
18.02.2008
ADMISSIBLE Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien Patente (VTP) 40191 Düsseldorf / DE | [2008/13] | 26.05.2008 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 06.06.2008 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2008/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]GB780885 (INNOXA ENGLAND LTD, et al) [X] 1-6,10,12 * the whole document *; | [X]US5082652 (MAYFIELD LARRY [US], et al) [X] 1-4,7,8,11,13,14,20,22,23 * example 1; claims 1-15 *; | [A]US5810252 (PENNAMEN YANNICK [FR], et al) [A] 21-28* the whole document *; | [X]US5945085 (SALAS LUCIA [US], et al) [X] 1-4,7,11,13-15,20,22 * example 1; claims 1,10-26 *; | [DA]FR2781208 (OREAL [FR]) [DA] 21-28 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2785594 (OREAL [FR]) [A] 21-28 * the whole document *; | [X]EP1004288 (WELLA AG [DE]) [X] 1-20 * page 2, line 45 - page 3, line 55; example 1; claims 1-5 * |