EP1350589 - DEVICE FOR WELDING NUT OR THE LIKE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.11.2005 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.11.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.01.2006 [2006/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha SMK 830-5, Ooi, Tsukui-machi Tsukui-gun Kanagawa 220-0202 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/41] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha SMK 830-5, Ooi, Tsukui-machi Tsukui-gun, Kanagawa 220-0202 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIDAKA, Masato, c/o kabushiki Kaisha SMK 830-5, Ooi, Tsukui-machi Tsukui-gun, Kanagawa 220-0202 / JP | [2003/41] | Representative(s) | Alexander, Thomas Bruce, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam gardens 70, Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/41] | Alexander, Thomas Bruce, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 01270403.7 | 10.12.2001 | [2003/41] | WO2001JP10790 | Priority number, date | JP20000378620 | 13.12.2000 Original published format: JP 2000378620 | [2003/41] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0247862 | Date: | 20.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1350589 | Date: | 08.10.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.06.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 20.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B23K11/14, B23K11/31 | [2003/41] | CPC: |
B23K11/14 (EP,KR,US);
B23K11/3018 (EP,US);
B23K11/3081 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB [2004/22] |
Former [2003/41] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM SCHWEISSEN VON MUTTERN ODER DERGLEICHEN | [2003/41] | English: | DEVICE FOR WELDING NUT OR THE LIKE | [2003/41] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SOUDAGE D'UN ECROU OU ANALOGUE | [2003/41] | Entry into regional phase | 20.06.2003 | Translation filed | 20.06.2003 | National basic fee paid | 20.06.2003 | Search fee paid | 20.06.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.06.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.05.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 20.06.2003 | Examination requested [2003/41] | 01.07.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/02] | 09.08.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2006/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2004 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPH10328852 (SEKI KOGYO KK); | [Y]JPH10328851 (DENGENSHA MFG CO LTD); | [Y]JPH06246460 (YAJIMA GIKEN KK); | [Y]JPH07100660 (HIRATA KK); | [A]JPH04339574 (DAIHATSU MOTOR CO LTD); | [A]JPH01299782 (AOYAMA YOSHITAKA) |