EP1344772 - ARYLBIS (PERFLUOROALKYLSULFONYL) METHANE, METAL SALT OF THE SAME, AND PROCESSES FOR PRODUCING THESE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.05.2010 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.06.2010 [2010/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Japan Science and Technology Agency 4-1-8, Honcho Kawaguchi-shi Saitama / JP | [2009/30] |
Former [2004/27] | For all designated states Japan Science and Technology Agency 4-1-8, Honcho Kawaguchi-shi Saitama / JP | ||
Former [2003/38] | For all designated states JAPAN SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION 1-8, Honcho 4-chome Kawaguchi-shi, Saitama 332-0012 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISHIHARA, Kazuaki 78, Higashiyama, Hannyacho Konan-shi, Aichi 483-8012 / JP | 02 /
YAMAMOTO, Hisashi Room B402, 17-1, Yamate-dori 1-chome, Showa-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 466-0815 / JP | [2003/38] | Representative(s) | Tanner, James Percival, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/38] | Tanner, James Percival, et al D. Young & Co, 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 01270523.2 | 14.12.2001 | [2003/38] | WO2001JP10978 | Priority number, date | JP20000381537 | 15.12.2000 Original published format: JP 2000381537 | JP20000381539 | 15.12.2000 Original published format: JP 2000381539 | JP20010283216 | 18.09.2001 Original published format: JP 2001283216 | JP20010283217 | 18.09.2001 Original published format: JP 2001283217 | [2003/38] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0248098 | Date: | 20.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1344772 | Date: | 17.09.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.06.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1344772 | Date: | 22.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 20.06.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C07C317/10, C07C315/00, B01J31/22, C07C69/78, C07C67/08, C07C47/445, C07C45/69, C07F1/02, C07F1/10, C07F5/00, B01J31/02 | [2005/10] | CPC: |
B01J31/0227 (EP);
C07C317/10 (EP,KR);
B01J31/122 (EP);
C07C45/69 (EP);
C07C67/08 (EP);
B01J2231/122 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C07C45/69, C07C47/445 (EP);
C07C67/08, C07C69/78 (EP) |
Former IPC [2003/38] | C07C317/10, C07C315/00, B01J31/22, C07C69/78, C07C67/08, C07C47/445, C07C45/69, // (C07F1/02, 1:10, 5:00) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/21] |
Former [2003/38] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ARYLBIS(PERFLUORALKYLSULFONYL)-METHAN, DESSEN METALLSALZ UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG | [2003/38] | English: | ARYLBIS (PERFLUOROALKYLSULFONYL) METHANE, METAL SALT OF THE SAME, AND PROCESSES FOR PRODUCING THESE | [2003/38] | French: | ARYLBIS (PERFLUOROALKYLSULFONYL) METHANE, SON SEL METALLIQUE ET LEURS PROCEDES DE PRODUCTION | [2003/38] | Entry into regional phase | 12.06.2003 | Translation filed | 12.06.2003 | National basic fee paid | 12.06.2003 | Search fee paid | 12.06.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.06.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.05.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 12.06.2003 | Examination requested [2003/38] | 26.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 03.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.03.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 26.03.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.04.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4431845 (YOUNG CHUNG I [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * column 6, line 39 - column 7, line 18; claim 4 *; | [AD]JPH07246338 ; | [E]EP1375532 (JAPAN SCIENCE & TECH CORP [JP]) [E] 1-54 * the whole document * | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960131), vol. 1996, no. 01, & JP07246338 A 19950926 (CENTRAL GLASS CO LTD) [AD] 17-58 * abstract * | [A] - ISHIHARA, K. ET AL., "Scandium Trifluoromethanesulfonate as an extremely active lewis acid catalyst in acylation of alcohols with acid anhydrides and mixed anhydrides", J.ORG.CHEM., (1996), vol. 61, pages 4560 - 4567, XP002313300 [A] 17-58 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo952237x | [PX] - ISHIHARA, KAZUAKI ET AL, "Polystyrene-bound tetrafluorophenylbis(triflyl)methane as an organic-solvent-swellable and strong bronsted acid catalyst", ANGEWANDTE CHEMIE, (20011105), vol. 113, no. 21, pages 4201 - 4203, XP002313301 [PX] 1-4,6-15,17-22 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/1521-3757(20011105)113:21<4201::AID-ANGE4201>3.0.CO;2-I | International search | [X]JPH03254697 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND); | [A]US4049861 (NOZARI MOHAMMAD S) | [X] - ZHU, SHIZHENG, "Synthesis and reactions of phenyliodonium bis(perfluoroalkanesulfonyl) methides", HETEROAT. CHEM., (1994), vol. 5, no. 1, pages 9 - 18, XP002909424 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/hc.520050104 | [X] - ZHU, SHIZHENG, "A new synthetic route to arylbis(perfluoroalkanesulfonyl)-methanes; structures of tolyldiazonium bis(trifluoromethanesulfonyl)methide and 4-nitrophenylhydrazonobis(trifluoromethanesulfonyl)methane", J. FLUORINE CHEM., (1993), vol. 64, no. 1-2, pages 47 - 60, XP002051636 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0022-1139(00)80062-7 | [X] - LISTON, DAVID J. ET AL., "Observations on silver salt metathesis reactions with very weakly coordinating anions", J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1989), vol. 111, no. 17, pages 6643 - 6648, XP002909425 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja00199a025 |