EP1359837 - ANALYTE MEASUREMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.03.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lifescan Scotland Ltd Beechwood Park North Inverness, IV2 3ED, Scotland / GB | [2013/21] |
Former [2006/12] | For all designated states Lifescan Scotland Ltd Beechwood Park North Inverness Inverness-shire IV2 3ED / GB | ||
Former [2003/46] | For all designated states Inverness Medical Limited Beechwood Park North Iverness IV2 3ED / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STIENE, Matthias 66 Crown Drive Inverness IV2 3QG / GB | 02 /
RICHTER, Tanja 6 Paton Street Inverness IV2 4SN / GB | 03 /
ALLEN, John 1020 Brompton Place Mendota Heights, MN 55118 / US | 04 /
MCALEER, Jerome 52 Nobles Close Grove, Oxfordshire / GB | [2003/46] | Representative(s) | Brunner, John Michael Owen, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2014/12] |
Former [2013/21] | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | ||
Former [2003/46] | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43, Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 01271174.3 | 19.12.2001 | [2003/46] | WO2001GB05634 | Priority number, date | GB20000030929 | 19.12.2000 Original published format: GB 0030929 | [2003/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0249507 | Date: | 27.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1359837 | Date: | 12.11.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1359837 | Date: | 22.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00, A61B5/15, A61B10/00 | [2003/46] | CPC: |
A61B5/14514 (EP,US);
A61B10/0045 (EP,US);
A61B5/1473 (EP,US);
A61B5/150022 (EP,US);
A61B5/150213 (EP,US);
A61B5/150358 (EP,US);
A61B5/150419 (EP,US);
A61B5/15045 (EP,US);
A61B5/150755 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/46] | Title | German: | ANALYTMESSUNG | [2003/46] | English: | ANALYTE MEASUREMENT | [2003/46] | French: | MESURE D'ANALYTE | [2003/46] | Entry into regional phase | 16.06.2003 | National basic fee paid | 16.06.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.06.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.07.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.06.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.06.2003 | Examination requested [2003/46] | 13.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.07.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 06.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.04.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 05.04.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP06076969.2 / EP1769735 | EP10182356.5 / EP2305102 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.07.2005 | Opposition(s) | 25.02.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/18] | Request for further processing for: | 06.10.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 06.10.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.10.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.05.2013 | BE | 22.05.2013 | CY | 22.05.2013 | DK | 22.05.2013 | FI | 22.05.2013 | MC | 22.05.2013 | NL | 22.05.2013 | SE | 22.05.2013 | TR | 22.05.2013 | GR | 23.08.2013 | PT | 23.09.2013 | LU | 19.12.2013 | [2015/32] |
Former [2015/30] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
CY | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
MC | 22.05.2013 | ||
NL | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
LU | 19.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
MC | 22.05.2013 | ||
NL | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
LU | 19.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
NL | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/06] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | PT | 23.09.2013 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4873993 (MESEROL PETER M [US], et al) [A] 76,77 * abstract *; | [A]WO9510221 (KORF JAKOB [NL], et al) [A] 28-33,84-87,93-98,106-108,131-135,145-147 * abstract * * page 7, line 3 - page 14, line 32; tables 1,2 *; | [A]WO9719344 (LEGACY GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL [US], et al) [A] 1-5,27,40,59,61,100,122,159 * page 9, line 17 - page 11, line 7 * * page 15, line 21 - page 17, line 11; tables 1-3,7-9 *; | [DA]WO0022977 (KNOLL MEINHARD [DE]) [DA] 6,12-26,42-58,71-74,80-86,106-116,131-139,145,150,151,173-175 * page 3, line 11 - page 9, line 15 * * page 10, line 20 - page 27, line 24; tables 1-11 *; | [PA]WO0164105 (INVERNESS MEDICAL TECHNOLOGY I [US], et al) [PA] 1,17-40,59,61,75,100,122,138,139,145,150,151,156,159 * abstract ** page 10, line 22 - page 15, line 4; tables 7-10 * | Examination | WO9533504 | US5801057 | US6083196 | WO0074766 | WO0136666 | US6271040 | by applicant | WO9533504 | US5801057 | WO0022977 | US6083196 | WO0074766 | WO0164105 |