EP1352658 - PREVENTIVES OR REMEDIES FOR ENDOMETRIOSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.04.2011 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 31.10.2012 [2012/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tochigi Institute of Clinical Pathology 2308-3, Minamiakatsuka, Nogi-machi Shimotsuga-gun Tochigi 329-0112 / JP | [2010/22] |
Former [2003/42] | For all designated states Tochigi Institute of Clinical Pathology 2308-3, Minamiakatsuka, Nogi-machi Shimotsuga-gun, Tochigi 329-0112 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUGAMATA, Masao 2308-3, Minamiakatsuka Nogi-machi, Shimotsuga-gun, Tochigi 329- / JP | [2003/42] | Representative(s) | Stuart, Ian Alexander, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Stuart, Ian Alexander, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | ||
Former [2003/42] | Stuart, Ian Alexander, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 01271228.7 | 18.12.2001 | [2003/42] | WO2001JP11069 | Priority number, date | JP20000383224 | 18.12.2000 Original published format: JP 2000383224 | [2003/42] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0249670 | Date: | 27.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1352658 | Date: | 15.10.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1352658 | Date: | 02.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.06.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/00, A61K31/41, A61K31/4535, A61K31/55, A61P15/00 | [2009/31] | CPC: |
A61K31/551 (EP,US);
A61K31/55 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/41 (EP,US);
A61K31/4535 (EP,US);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2003/42] | A61K45/00, A61K31/41, A61K31/4535, A61K31/55, A61P15/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/42] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORBEUGUNGS- ODER HEILMITTEL GEGEN ENDOMETRIOSE | [2003/42] | English: | PREVENTIVES OR REMEDIES FOR ENDOMETRIOSIS | [2003/42] | French: | MEDICAMENTS PREVENTIFS OU REMEDES POUR L'ENDOMETRIOSE | [2003/42] | Entry into regional phase | 01.07.2003 | Translation filed | 07.07.2003 | National basic fee paid | 07.07.2003 | Search fee paid | 07.07.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.07.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.07.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 07.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/42] | 18.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.07.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 15.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.11.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 12.11.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/19] | Request for further processing for: | 15.09.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 15.09.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.10.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.06.2010 | CY | 02.06.2010 | FI | 02.06.2010 | GR | 03.09.2010 | PT | 04.10.2010 | IE | 18.12.2010 | LU | 18.12.2010 | MC | 31.12.2010 | [2012/44] |
Former [2011/47] | AT | 02.06.2010 | |
CY | 02.06.2010 | ||
FI | 02.06.2010 | ||
GR | 03.09.2010 | ||
PT | 04.10.2010 | ||
IE | 18.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/36] | AT | 02.06.2010 | |
CY | 02.06.2010 | ||
FI | 02.06.2010 | ||
GR | 03.09.2010 | ||
PT | 04.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | AT | 02.06.2010 | |
CY | 02.06.2010 | ||
FI | 02.06.2010 | ||
GR | 03.09.2010 | ||
PT | 04.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/05] | AT | 02.06.2010 | |
CY | 02.06.2010 | ||
FI | 02.06.2010 | ||
GR | 03.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/01] | AT | 02.06.2010 | |
FI | 02.06.2010 | ||
GR | 03.09.2010 | ||
Former [2010/50] | AT | 02.06.2010 | |
FI | 02.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/49] | AT | 02.06.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y] - ABU,J.I. ET AL, "Leukotrienes in gynecology: the hypothetical value of anti-leukotriene therapy in dysmenorrhoea and endometriosis", HUMAN REPRODUCTION UPDATE, (200004), vol. 6, no. 2, pages 200 - 206, XP002908885 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/humupd/6.2.200 | [Y] - TOSHIO NUMAO, "Kou-allergy-yaku no tenbou; Byoutai ni oujita sentaku-teki kouenshou-yaku no kanousei", IGAKU NO AYUMI, (1997), vol. 180, no. 1, pages 70 - 74, XP002908886 | [AP] - ICHIRO UCHIDE, "Rat shikyuu naimaku-shou model no kanshitsu ni okeru allergy-sei henka ni tsuite", NIPPON SANKA FUJINKA GAKKAI ZASSHI, (2001), vol. 53, no. 2, page 510, XP002908887 | [A] - ICHIRO UCHIDE, "Rat shikuyuu naimaku-shou model ni okeru shikyuu naimaku-shou shoki byouhen no keitaigaku-teki kousatsu", NIPPON FUNIN GAKKAI ZASSHI, (20001001), vol. 45, no. 4, page 268, XP002908888 |