EP1346962 - FILM-REINFORCED GLASSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.10.2016 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.11.2016 [2016/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bridgestone Corporation 10-1, Kyobashi 1-Chome Chuo-Ku Tokyo 104-0031 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/39] | For all designated states BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION 10-1, Kyobashi 1-Chome, Chuo-Ku Tokyo 104-0031 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HASHIMOTO, Masao c/o Bridgestone Corporation Yokohama Kojo Kashio-cho 1-banchi Totsuka-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 244-0812 / JP | 02 /
OKADA, Tokuo c/o Bridgestone Corporation Yokohama Kojo Kashio-cho 1-banchi Totsuka-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 244-0812 / JP | [2003/39] | Representative(s) | Staudt, Hans-Peter, et al Staudt IP Law Donaustrasse 7 85049 Ingolstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/39] | Staudt, Hans-Peter, Dipl.-Ing., et al Harderstrasse 39 85049 Ingolstadt / DE | Application number, filing date | 01271333.5 | 17.12.2001 | [2003/39] | WO2001JP11035 | Priority number, date | JP20000383929 | 18.12.2000 Original published format: JP 2000383929 | JP20000387391 | 20.12.2000 Original published format: JP 2000387391 | JP20010066280 | 09.03.2001 Original published format: JP 2001066280 | [2003/39] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0249982 | Date: | 27.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1346962 | Date: | 24.09.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.06.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C03C27/12, B32B17/10 | [2003/39] | CPC: |
B32B17/10761 (EP,US);
B32B17/10018 (EP,US);
B32B17/10605 (EP,US);
B32B17/10788 (EP,US);
B32B27/36 (EP,US);
C03C17/34 (EP,US);
C03C17/3405 (EP,US);
B32B2367/00 (EP,US);
B32B2369/00 (EP,US);
C03C2217/445 (EP,US);
C03C2217/478 (EP,US);
Y10T428/259 (EP,US);
Y10T428/26 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31507 (EP,US);
Y10T428/3163 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31649 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31667 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31797 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/22] |
Former [2003/39] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | FILMVERSTÄRKTE GLÄSER | [2003/39] | English: | FILM-REINFORCED GLASSES | [2003/39] | French: | VERRES RENFORCES PAR UN FILM | [2003/39] | Entry into regional phase | 20.08.2002 | Translation filed | 20.08.2002 | National basic fee paid | 20.08.2002 | Search fee paid | 20.08.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.08.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.08.2002 | Examination requested [2003/39] | 25.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.06.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.06.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/45] | 06.07.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/45] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.03.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 16.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 17.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 30.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 19.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 17.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH01239041 ; | [Y]JPS61155232 ; | [Y]JPH10130037 ; | [A]US4865918 (TANUMA ITSUO [JP], et al) [A] 1,13,14,19,30-33 * column 2, line 22 - column 3, line 47; claims 1-12 *; | [A]US4910074 (FUKAWA SATORU [JP], et al) [A] 1,13,14,19,30-33 * column 2, line 34 - column 3, line 66; claims 1-15 *; | [Y]JPH04261842 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD) [Y] 1,13,14,19,30-33* abstract *; | [A]WO9324320 (DU PONT [US], et al) [A] 1,13,14,19,30-33 * page 1, line 28 - page 2, line 14 * * page 3, line 28 - page 4, line 35; claims 1-10 *; | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1989, no. 44, Database accession no. 1989-320679, XP002505125 & JPH01239041 A 19890925 (IIZUKA T) [Y] 1,13,14,19,30-33 * abstract * | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1986, no. 34, Database accession no. 1986-223076, XP002505127 & JPS61155232 A 19860714 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD) [Y] 1,13,14,19,30-33 * abstract * | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1998, no. 30, Database accession no. 1998-343102, XP002505238 & JPH10130037 A 19980519 (TOTO LTD) [Y] 1,13,14,19,30-33 * abstract * | International search | [A]US4865918 (TANUMA ITSUO [JP], et al); | [A]JPH01239041 (IIZUKA TOSHIYUKI); | [A]WO9324320 (DU PONT [US], et al); | [A]JPH0699547 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND) |