EP1344151 - METHOD FOR DIVIDING STRUCTURED DOCUMENTS INTO SEVERAL PARTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.10.2017 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.11.2017 [2017/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Expway 16, rue Vauthier le Noir 51100 Reims / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/38] | For all designated states Expway 15, rue Vauthier le Noir 51100 Reims / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEYRAT, Claude 13, Impasse du Jeu de Boules F-75001 Paris / FR | 02 /
THIENOT, Cédric 115, rue Oberkampf F-75011 Paris / FR | [2003/44] |
Former [2003/38] | 01 /
SEYRAT, Claude 12, rue Rollin F-75005 Paris / FR | ||
02 /
THIENOT, Cédric 115, rue Oberkampf F-75011 Paris / FR | Representative(s) | Novagraaf Technologies Bâtiment O2 2, rue Sarah Bernhardt CS90017 92665 Asnières-sur-Seine Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/17] | Novagraaf Technologies 122 rue Edouard Vaillant 92593 Levallois-Perret Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2008/29] | Bentz, Jean-Paul, et al Novagraaf Technologies 122 Rue Edouard Vaillant 92593 Levallois-Perret Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2007/25] | Bentz, Jean-Paul, et al Novagraaf Technologies Cabinet Ballot 122, rue Edouard Vaillant 92593 Levallois-Perret Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2003/38] | de Roquemaurel, Bruno Novagraaf Technologies 122, rue Edouard Vaillant 92593 Levallois Perret Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 01271587.6 | 14.12.2001 | [2003/38] | WO2001FR04008 | Priority number, date | FR20000016507 | 18.12.2000 Original published format: FR 0016507 | [2003/38] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0250708 | Date: | 27.06.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1344151 | Date: | 17.09.2003 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2003/38] | CPC: |
G06F16/986 (EP,US);
Y10S707/99942 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/38] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR TEILUNG VON STRUKTURIERTEN DOKUMENTEN IN MEHRERE TEILE | [2003/38] | English: | METHOD FOR DIVIDING STRUCTURED DOCUMENTS INTO SEVERAL PARTS | [2003/38] | French: | PROCEDE POUR DIVISER DES DOCUMENTS STRUCTURES EN PLUSIEURS PARTIES | [2003/38] | Entry into regional phase | 20.06.2003 | National basic fee paid | 20.06.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.06.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.06.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.06.2003 | Examination requested [2003/38] | 12.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.09.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/48] | 27.07.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/48] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.11.2003 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 09.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 13.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 19.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 02.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2016 | 16   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9734240 (UNIV MASSACHUSETTS [US]) [X] 1-12 * page 2, line 13 - page 3, line 14 * * page 4, line 2 - page 5, line 24 * * page 14, line 22 - page 17, line 23 * * page 19, line 8 - page 23, line 2 *; | [A]EP0928070 (UNWIRED PLANET INC [US]) [A] 1-10 * column 11, line 42 - column 12, line 23 * * column 13, line 53 - column 14, line 28 ** column 16, line 25 - column 17, line 7 *; | [X]US6119123 (ELENBAAS JAN HERMANUS [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 2, line 45 - column 4, line 43 *; | [A] - LIEFKE H ET AL, "XMILL: AN EFFICIENT COMPRESSOR FOR XML DATA", SIGMOD RECORD, ASSOCIATION FOR COMPUTING MACHINERY, NEW YORK, US, (200006), vol. 29, no. 2, pages 153 - 164, XP001002286 [A] 11 * page 153, column R, line 30 - page 154, column L, line 6; figure 3 * * page 157, column L, line 19 - page 157, column R, line 27 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/335191.335405 |