EP1344164 - PAYMENT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.11.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.11.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.12.2006 [2006/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | [2003/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KORHONEN, Aki, T. Pohjoiskaari 14 A 6 FIN-00200 Helsinki / FI | 02 /
MARTIN, Markus Puistokaari 6 A 8 FIN-00200 Helsinki / FI | [2003/38] | Representative(s) | Holmström, Stefan Mikael Kolster Oy Ab Iso Roobertinkatu 23 P.O. Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2003/38] | Holmström, Stefan Mikael Kolster Oy Ab, Iso Roobertinkatu 23, P.O. Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 01271595.9 | 13.12.2001 | [2003/38] | WO2001FI01091 | Priority number, date | FI20000002804 | 20.12.2000 Original published format: FI 20002804 | [2003/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0250727 | Date: | 27.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1344164 | Date: | 17.09.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 27.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/60, H04Q7/38 | [2003/38] | CPC: |
G06Q30/04 (EP,US);
G06Q20/04 (EP,US);
G06Q20/14 (EP,US);
G06Q20/403 (EP,US);
H04M15/00 (EP,US);
H04M15/51 (EP,US);
H04M15/68 (EP,US);
H04M15/745 (EP,US);
H04M15/8033 (EP,US);
H04M15/854 (EP,US);
H04M15/88 (EP,US);
H04M17/00 (EP,US);
H04M17/10 (EP,US);
H04W4/24 (EP,US);
H04M2215/0108 (EP,US);
H04M2215/0116 (EP,US);
H04M2215/0196 (EP,US);
H04M2215/2026 (EP,US);
H04M2215/32 (EP,US);
H04M2215/54 (EP,US);
H04M2215/7435 (EP,US);
H04M2215/8166 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/38] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEZAHLUNGSSYSTEM | [2003/38] | English: | PAYMENT SYSTEM | [2003/38] | French: | SYSTEME DE PAIEMENT | [2003/38] | Entry into regional phase | 13.09.2002 | National basic fee paid | 13.09.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.09.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.09.2002 | Examination requested [2003/38] | 01.07.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/51] | 04.08.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2006/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2005 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9411849 (VATANEN HARRI TAPANI [FI]); | [A]WO9613814 (VAZVAN BEHRUZ [FI]); | [A]WO0004702 (NOKIA NETWORKS OY [FI], et al) |