EP1346972 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING OPTICALLY ACTIVE HALOHYDRIN COMPOUND [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.12.2008 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ajinomoto Co., Inc. 15-1 Kyobashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0031 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/39] | For all designated states Ajinomoto Co., Inc. 15-1 Kyobashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0031 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TORII, Takayoshi, c/o Ajinomoto Co., Inc. AminoScience Lab., 1, Suzuki-cho, Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 210-8681 / JP | 02 /
HAMADA, Takayuki, c/o Ajinomoto Co., Inc. AminoScience Lab., 1-1, Suzuki-cho, Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 210-8681 / JP | 03 /
ONISHI, Tomoyuki, c/o Ajinomoto Co., Inc. AminoScience Lab., 1-1, Suzuki-cho, Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 210-8681 / JP | 04 /
IZAWA, Kunisuke, c/o Ajinomoto Co., Inc. AminoScience Lab., 1-1, Suzuki-cho, Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 210-8681 / JP | 05 /
IKARIYA, Takao 4-5-5-602, Tabata Kita-ku, Tokyo 114-0014 / JP | 06 /
NOYORI, Ryoji 135-417, Shinden, Umemori-cho Nisshin-shi, Aichi 470-0132 / JP | [2003/39] | Representative(s) | Nicholls, Kathryn Margaret, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/39] | Nicholls, Kathryn Margaret, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 01271847.4 | 18.12.2001 | [2003/39] | WO2001JP11105 | Priority number, date | JP20000391776 | 25.12.2000 Original published format: JP 2000391776 | JP20000237041 | 03.08.2001 Original published format: JP 2000237041 | JP20010314619 | 12.10.2001 Original published format: JP 2001314619 | [2003/39] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02051781 | Date: | 04.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1346972 | Date: | 24.09.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.07.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.07.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C07C33/46, C07C29/143, C07C43/178, C07C49/747, C07C211/52, C07C209/78, C07C45/64, C07C41/26, C07C23/08, C07C311/17, C07C303/40, C07B53/00 | [2005/22] | CPC: |
C07D307/42 (EP,US);
C07C29/143 (EP,KR,US);
C07C213/00 (EP,US);
C07C215/68 (EP,US);
C07C231/12 (EP,US);
C07C233/73 (EP,US);
C07C269/06 (EP,US);
C07C271/16 (EP,US);
C07D303/04 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C07C29/143, C07C33/46 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/39] | C07C33/46, C07C29/143, C07C43/178, C07C49/747, C07C211/52, C07C209/78, C07C45/64, C07C41/26, C07C23/08, C07C311/17, C07C303/40, C07C271/16, C07C269/06, C07C233/73, C07C231/12, C07D307/42, C07D317/54, C07D301/26, C07D303/04, C07M7/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/39] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON OPTISCH AKTIVEN HALOGENHYDRINVERBINDUNGEN | [2003/39] | English: | PROCESS FOR PRODUCING OPTICALLY ACTIVE HALOHYDRIN COMPOUND | [2003/39] | French: | PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE PREPARER UN COMPOSE D'HALOHYDRINE OPTIQUEMENT ACTIF | [2003/39] | Entry into regional phase | 13.05.2003 | Translation filed | 23.05.2003 | National basic fee paid | 23.05.2003 | Search fee paid | 23.05.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.05.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.04.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 23.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/39] | 05.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/02] | 21.08.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2009/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA] - MURATA, KUNIHIKO ET AL, "New Chiral Rhodium and Iridium Complexes with Chiral Diamine Ligands for Asymmetric Transfer Hydrogenation of Aromatic Ketones", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY , 64(7), 2186-2187 CODEN: JOCEAH; ISSN: 0022-3263, (1999), XP002322557 [DA] 1-7,9-15 * page 2186, column 2; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo990213a | [A] - COREY, E. J. ET AL, "An efficient and catalytically enantioselective route to (S)-(-)-phenyloxirane", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY , 53(12), 2861-3 CODEN: JOCEAH; ISSN: 0022-3263, (1988), XP002200365 [A] 1,8 * page 2863, column 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo00247a044 | [A] - MASHIMA, KAZUSHI ET AL, "The half-sandwich hydride and 16-electron complexes of rhodium and iridium containing (1S,2S)-N-(p-toluenesulfonyl)-1,2- diphenylethylenediamine: relevant to asymmetric transfer hydrogenation", CHEMISTRY LETTERS , (12), 1201-1202 CODEN: CMLTAG; ISSN: 0366-7022, (1998), XP002930318 [A] 1,9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1246/cl.1998.1201 | [A] - MASHIMA, KAZUSHI ET AL, "Asymmetric transfer hydrogenation of ketonic substrates catalyzed by (.eta.5-C5Me5)MCl complexes (M = Rh and Ir) of (1S,2S)-N-(p- toluenesulfonyl)-1,2-diphenylethylenediamine", CHEMISTRY LETTERS , (12), 1199-1200 CODEN: CMLTAG; ISSN: 0366-7022, (1998), XP002930317 [A] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1246/cl.1998.1199 | [PX] - CROSS, D. J. ET AL, "Rhodium versus ruthenium: contrasting behavior in the asymmetric transfer hydrogenation of .alpha.-substituted acetophenones", TETRAHEDRON: ASYMMETRY , 12(12), 1801-1806 CODEN: TASYE3; ISSN: 0957-4166, (2001), XP004298264 [PX] 1-4,7,9-12,15 * page 1803, column 2, scheme 6; page 1805 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0957-4166(01)00313-5 | International search | [Y]JP2000212110 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP); | [Y]JP2000327659 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP); | [Y]EP0754669 (KANEKA CORP [JP]); | [Y]EP0736509 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]); | [Y]EP0713848 (SUMIKA FINE CHEMICALS COMPANY [JP], et al); | [Y]JP2000169406 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO); | [Y]JP2000256235 (NIHON NOHYAKU CO LTD) | [YP] - THORPE T. ET AL., "Efficient rhodium and iridium-catalysed asymmetric transfer hydrogenation using water-soluble aminosulfonamide ligands", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (2001), vol. 42, pages 4041 - 4043, XP004240848 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4039(01)00624-4 | Examination | - KENNY J.A. ET AL, "Asymmetric Transfer Hydrogenation of alpha-Amino and alpha-Alkoxy sunstituted Ketones", SYNLETT, (1999), no. 10, pages 1615 - 1617 |