|
17.09.2015 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.09.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.08.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.08.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.08.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.08.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.08.2015 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
7 |
|
17.08.2015 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.08.2015 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.08.2015 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.08.2015 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.08.2015 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.08.2015 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.08.2015 |
F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.08.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.08.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.08.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.08.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.08.2015 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.08.2015 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.08.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.08.2015 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
04.08.2015 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
10.07.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.07.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.07.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2015 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2015 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
09.07.2015 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
08.07.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.07.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.07.2015 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.06.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.05.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.05.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.05.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.05.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.05.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.05.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.05.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.05.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.05.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.05.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.05.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.05.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.05.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.05.2015 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.05.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.05.2015 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
19.05.2015 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
16 |
|
19.05.2015 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
16 |
|
19.05.2015 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
18.05.2015 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.05.2015 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.05.2015 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
5 |
|
13.05.2015 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.05.2015 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.02.2015 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.10.2014 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
01.08.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.08.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.08.2014 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.08.2014 |
Communication of amended entries |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.07.2014 |
Request for change of name -opponent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.07.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.07.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.07.2014 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.05.2014 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Opposition |
3 |
|
20.12.2013 |
F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.12.2013 |
F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.12.2013 |
F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.12.2013 |
F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.06.2013 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.03.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.03.2012 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
19 |
|
09.03.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.03.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.03.2012 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.03.2012 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
06.12.2011 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.12.2011 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.11.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.11.2011 |
Claims |
Appeal |
18 |
|
30.11.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.11.2011 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.11.2011 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.11.2011 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
21.11.2011 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
07.11.2011 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.11.2011 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
27.10.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.10.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
18 |
|
27.10.2011 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
27.10.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.10.2011 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
27.10.2011 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
27.10.2011 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
27.10.2011 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
27.10.2011 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.10.2011 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
27.10.2011 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
27.10.2011 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
27.10.2011 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
27.10.2011 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
27.10.2011 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
37 |
|
27.10.2011 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
27.10.2011 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
27.10.2011 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.10.2011 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.10.2011 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
27.10.2011 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.10.2011 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
27.10.2011 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
27.10.2011 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.10.2011 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
27.10.2011 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
27.10.2011 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
27.10.2011 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
27.10.2011 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
27.10.2011 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
27.10.2011 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
27.10.2011 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
27.10.2011 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
27.10.2011 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
27.10.2011 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
22 |
|
27.10.2011 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
35 |
|
27.10.2011 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.09.2011 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.09.2011 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.09.2011 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
30.08.2011 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.08.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.08.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.08.2011 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.08.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.07.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.07.2011 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.06.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.06.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.06.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.06.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.06.2011 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.06.2011 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.06.2011 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
17.06.2011 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.06.2011 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
17.06.2011 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
26.05.2011 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.03.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
22.03.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
22.03.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.03.2011 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.03.2011 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.02.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.02.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.02.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.02.2011 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
18.02.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.02.2011 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.02.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.02.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.02.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.02.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.02.2011 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
08.02.2011 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
08.02.2011 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
08.02.2011 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.02.2011 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.02.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.02.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.01.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.01.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.01.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.01.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.01.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.01.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.01.2011 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.01.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.01.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
27.01.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.01.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
27.01.2011 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
12 |
|
21.01.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.01.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.01.2011 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
21.01.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
21.01.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
21.01.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.01.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
21.01.2011 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
13 |
|
20.01.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.01.2011 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
4 |
|
20.01.2011 |
Citation for the examination procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.01.2011 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
20.01.2011 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
20.01.2011 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
20.01.2011 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.01.2011 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
26 |
|
20.01.2011 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
20.01.2011 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
20.01.2011 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
20.01.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
3 |
|
20.01.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.01.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
20.01.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.01.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
20.01.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
20.01.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
47 |
|
20.01.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
20.01.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
24 |
|
20.01.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
20.01.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
20.01.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
20.01.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
20.01.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
20.01.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
72 |
|
20.01.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
20.01.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
20.01.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
20.01.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
20.01.2011 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
12 |
|
20.01.2011 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
19.01.2011 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.01.2011 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.01.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.01.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.01.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.01.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.01.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.01.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.01.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.01.2011 |
Withdrawal of an opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.01.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.01.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.01.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.01.2011 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
59 |
|
04.01.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
04.01.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
04.01.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
04.01.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
04.01.2011 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.01.2011 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
12 |
|
24.12.2010 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
59 |
|
24.12.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.12.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.12.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.12.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
24.12.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
24.12.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
24.12.2010 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.12.2010 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
12 |
|
06.12.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.12.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.12.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.12.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.12.2010 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.12.2010 |
General authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.12.2010 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.12.2010 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.12.2010 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.2010 |
General authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.2010 |
General authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.2010 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.2010 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.10.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.10.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.10.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.2010 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.2010 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.10.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.10.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.10.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.10.2010 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.10.2010 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.10.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.10.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.10.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.10.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.10.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.10.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.10.2010 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
07.10.2010 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
07.10.2010 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.10.2010 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.10.2010 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.10.2010 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.10.2010 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.09.2010 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.06.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.06.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.06.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.06.2010 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
06.04.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.04.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.04.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.04.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.04.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.04.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.03.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.03.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
29.03.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
29.03.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
29.03.2010 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
25 |
|
26.03.2010 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.03.2010 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
513 |
|
26.03.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
26.03.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
26.03.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.03.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
26.03.2010 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.03.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
26.03.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
26.03.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
26.03.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
26.03.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
26.03.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
26.03.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
26.03.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
26.03.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
26.03.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
26.03.2010 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
25 |
|
22.01.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.01.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.01.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.01.2010 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.01.2010 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.2009 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.11.2009 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.07.2009 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.07.2009 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.07.2009 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.07.2009 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.06.2009 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.06.2009 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.06.2009 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.06.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
09.06.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
44 |
|
09.06.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
09.06.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
09.06.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.06.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.06.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
09.06.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
44 |
|
09.06.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
09.06.2009 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
20 |
|
09.06.2009 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
09.06.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
09.06.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.06.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
42 |
|
09.06.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
09.06.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
81 |
|
09.06.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
09.06.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
09.06.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
81 |
|
09.06.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
04.06.2009 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.06.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
04.06.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
04.06.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.06.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
04.06.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
04.06.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
04.06.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
45 |
|
04.06.2009 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
04.06.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
97 |
|
04.06.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
04.06.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
04.06.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
09.03.2009 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.01.2009 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.2008 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.07.2008 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.07.2008 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.07.2008 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.07.2008 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.07.2008 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.04.2008 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.04.2008 |
Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.04.2008 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.03.2008 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.03.2008 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.03.2008 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.2008 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
22.01.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.01.2008 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
22.01.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.10.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.10.2007 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.12.2004 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.07.2004 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.05.2004 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.05.2004 |
Annex to European Search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.05.2004 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.05.2004 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.03.2004 |
Letter concerning search matters |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.09.2003 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.09.2003 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.08.2003 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.08.2003 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.08.2003 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
22.08.2003 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.06.2003 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.06.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.06.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.06.2003 |
Description |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
13.06.2003 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.06.2003 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.06.2003 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
26.05.2003 |
Translation of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
09.05.2003 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.11.2002 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.07.2002 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.07.2002 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
04.07.2002 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.07.2002 |
Copy of the translated international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.07.2002 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
12 |