EP1361423 - DEPOSIT DETECTOR AND CONTROL DEVICE USING IT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.12.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.01.2010 [2010/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NILES CO., LTD. 5-28-6 Omorinishi, Ota-ku Tokyo 143-8521 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/10] | For all designated states NILES CO., LTD. 5-28-6 Omorinishi, Ota-ku Tokyo 143-8521 / JP | ||
Former [2003/46] | For all designated states Nippon Sheet Glass Co., Ltd. 7-28, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-8559 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOBAYASHI, Fumitoshi NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO., LTD. 7-28, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-8559 / JP | 02 /
TSUNETOMO, Keiji c/o NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO., LTD. 7-28, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-8559 / JP | 03 /
YOSHIDA, Harunobu c/o NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO., LTD. 7-28, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-8559 / JP | 04 /
TOKUDA, Tatsumi c/o NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO., LTD. 7-28, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-8559 / JP | [2003/46] | Representative(s) | Power, Philippa Louise, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/46] | Power, Philippa Louise, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co., 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 01271873.0 | 25.12.2001 | [2003/46] | WO2001JP11323 | Priority number, date | JP20000391257 | 22.12.2000 Original published format: JP 2000391257 | [2003/46] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02052249 | Date: | 04.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1361423 | Date: | 12.11.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.07.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.07.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/17, B60S1/08 | [2006/12] | CPC: |
B60S1/0822 (EP,US);
G01N21/17 (KR);
B60S1/0833 (EP,US);
B60S1/0844 (EP,US);
G01N21/43 (EP,US);
G01N21/47 (EP,US);
G06V20/56 (EP,US);
B60S1/0837 (EP,US);
G01N2021/157 (EP,US);
Y10S318/02 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2003/46] | G01N21/17 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/22] |
Former [2003/46] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ABLAGERUNGSDETEKTOR UND DIESEN BENUTZENDE STEUEREINRICHTUNG | [2009/16] | English: | DEPOSIT DETECTOR AND CONTROL DEVICE USING IT | [2003/46] | French: | DETECTEUR DE DEPOTS ET DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE L'UTILISANT | [2003/46] |
Former [2003/46] | ABLAGERUNGSDETEKTOR UND STEUEREINRICHTUNG DAMIT | Entry into regional phase | 22.07.2003 | Translation filed | 22.07.2003 | National basic fee paid | 22.07.2003 | Search fee paid | 22.07.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.07.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.05.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 22.07.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/46] | 03.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.08.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/04] | 09.09.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2010/04] | Divisional application(s) | EP07004441.7 / EP1798540 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 01.07.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 01.07.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | 28.02.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 28.02.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.03.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE19704818 (MARQUARDT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-19 * column 2, line 13 - column 6, line 32 * * column 9, line 9 - column 10, line 55; figures 1,8,9 *; | [X]WO9947396 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,7-10,14,15,17,18 * column 2, line 10 - column 15, line 24; figures 1-10 *; | [X]US5313072 (VACHSS FREDERICK [US]) [X] 1,2,7-10,14,17,18 * column W *; | [X]EP0537471 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,13,14 * column W *; | [A]DE4200700 (SWF AUTO ELECTRIC GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [A]DE29500081U (WEBER JOSEF [DE]) [A] 1-19 * the whole document * | International search | [X]JPS6223850 (TOKAI RIKA CO LTD); | [X]JPH11295214 (NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO LTD); | [Y]WO9501561 (REIME GERD [DE]); | [Y]JPH02162245 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD); | [Y]JPS6425036 (NIPPON DENSO CO) |