EP1348323 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A SHIELD GASKET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.11.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.11.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.12.2007 [2007/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kahl, Helmut Horstwalder Strasse 23 12307 Berlin / DE | For all designated states Tiburtius, Bernd Rosenhag 10 14532 Kleinmachnow / DE | [2003/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2003/40] | Representative(s) | Keussen, Christof Glawe Delfs Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Rothenbaumchaussee 58 20148 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/10] | Keussen, Christof, Dr. Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner Patentanwälte Rothenbaumchaussee 58 20148 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2003/40] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Martinistrasse 24 28195 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 01271985.2 | 27.11.2001 | [2003/40] | WO2001EP13777 | Priority number, date | DE2000164968 | 23.12.2000 Original published format: DE 10064968 | [2003/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02052913 | Date: | 04.07.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1348323 | Date: | 01.10.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.07.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1348323 | Date: | 03.01.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H05K9/00 | [2003/40] | CPC: |
H05K9/0015 (EP,US);
Y10S277/919 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/20] |
Former [2003/40] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER ABSCHIRMDICHTUNG | [2003/40] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING A SHIELD GASKET | [2003/40] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'UNE GARNITURE DE BLINDAGE | [2003/40] | Entry into regional phase | 23.07.2003 | National basic fee paid | 23.07.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.07.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.06.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/40] | 23.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.09.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 18.09.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5246974 (JONAS REINHARD [DE], et al) [A] 1-8 * abstract *; | [A]WO9808364 (KAHL HELMUT [DE], et al) [A] 1-8* page 4, line 16 - line 25; figure - *; | [A]US6096413 (KALINOSKI JOHN P [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * column 4, line 9 - line 36; figure - * |