EP1344197 - METHOD AND ARRANGEMENT FOR PROCESSING A NOISE SIGNAL FROM A NOISE SOURCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.01.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.01.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.02.2006 [2006/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DaimlerChrysler AG Epplestrasse 225 70567 Stuttgart / DE | [2003/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHLIEP, Michael Grötzinger Strasse 22 72631 Aichtal / DE | 02 /
TÖRGYEKES, Szabolcs Bogenstrasse 9D 70569 Stuttgart / DE | 03 /
ZIPP, Walter Vogelsangstr. 53 70197 Stuttgart / DE | [2003/38] | Application number, filing date | 01272004.1 | 12.12.2001 | [2003/38] | WO2001EP14622 | Priority number, date | DE2000164754 | 22.12.2000 Original published format: DE 10064754 | [2003/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02052542 | Date: | 04.07.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/27] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1344197 | Date: | 17.09.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.07.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1344197 | Date: | 02.03.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.11.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G08G1/01 | [2003/38] | CPC: |
G08G1/015 (EP,US);
G08G1/01 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [2004/22] |
Former [2003/38] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ANORDNUNG ZUR BESTIMMUNG EINES GERÄUSCHSIGNALS EINER GERÄUSCHQUELLE | [2003/38] | English: | METHOD AND ARRANGEMENT FOR PROCESSING A NOISE SIGNAL FROM A NOISE SOURCE | [2003/38] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF D'ANALYSE D'UN SIGNAL SONORE ISSU D'UNE SOURCE SONORE | [2003/38] | Entry into regional phase | 14.06.2003 | National basic fee paid | 14.06.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.06.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.05.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.06.2003 | Examination requested [2003/38] | 08.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.07.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 17.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.12.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 09.12.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.12.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/08] | Request for further processing for: | 17.08.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 17.08.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 31.08.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]JPH0581595 ; | [Y]US5619616 (BRADY MARK J [US], et al) [Y] 3,9,14 * column 1, line 7 - line 31 * * column 2, line 50 - column 3, line 4 * * column 5, line 52 - column 6, line 1 *; | [Y]FR2790129 (SEEMULLER FRANK [FR]) [Y] 4,5,17 * page 2, line 23 - line 27 *; | [Y]US4806931 (NELSON THOMAS M [US]) [Y] 11 * column 1, line 5 - line 11; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [Y]US4952931 (SERAGELDIN AHMEDELHADI Y [US], et al) [Y] 19 * column 1, line 13 - line 21 * * column 5, line 20 - column 6, line 39 *; | [A]JPH03226629 | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930805), vol. 017, no. 422, Database accession no. (P - 1586), & JP05081595 A 19930402 (OKI ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1,2,7,10,12,13,16,18,20,21 * abstract * [Y] 3-5,9,11,14,17,19 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920107), vol. 016, no. 003, Database accession no. (P - 1294), & JP03226629 A 19911007 (OKI ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1,10 * abstract * |