EP1345872 - GAS GENERATOR FUEL COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.04.2007 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.05.2007 [2007/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIGU CHEMIE GMBH Beuthener Strasse 2 D-84478 Waldkraiburg / DE | [2003/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GAST, Eduard Marktplatz 27 84559 Kraiburg a. Inn / DE | 02 /
SCHMID, Bernhard Lauterbach 15 84431 Heldenstein / DE | 03 /
RECKER, Christian Wilhelm-Leuschner-Strasse 14 63654 Büdingen / DE | 04 /
WALZ, Sigmund Johann-Schroth-Strasse 14 84478 Waldkraiburg / DE | 05 /
MAYR, Thomas Zeppelinstrasse 6p 84478 Waldkraiburg / DE | 06 /
SEMMLER, Peter Lärchenstrasse 16 84544 Aschau am Inn / DE | [2003/39] | Representative(s) | Adam, Holger Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/39] | Adam, Holger, Dr. Kraus & Weisert, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01272021.5 | 17.12.2001 | [2003/39] | WO2001EP14901 | Priority number, date | DE2000164285 | 22.12.2000 Original published format: DE 10064285 | [2003/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02051773 | Date: | 04.07.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1345872 | Date: | 24.09.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.07.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1345872 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C06D5/06 | [2003/39] | CPC: |
C06B25/34 (EP,US);
C06D5/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR [2004/21] |
Former [2003/39] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GASGENERATORTREIBSTOFF-ZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2003/39] | English: | GAS GENERATOR FUEL COMPOSITION | [2003/39] | French: | COMPOSITION D'AGENTS PROPULSEURS POUR GENERATEURS DE GAZ | [2003/39] | Entry into regional phase | 29.04.2003 | National basic fee paid | 29.04.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.04.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.07.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/39] | 04.11.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.02.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 01.02.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB322427 (DU PONT) [A] 16* page 1, line 35 - line 95 *; | [X]GB656315 (ALEXANDER CANTLAY HUTCHISON, et al) [X] 1 * page 6, line 6 - line 70; claim - *; | [A]US4836255 (SCHNEITER FRED E [US], et al) [A] 4 * column 3, line 67 - column 4, line 22 *; | [Y]DE9416112U (CONTEC CHEMIEANLAGEN GMBH [DE]) [Y] 12-14 * page 3, line 11 - page 4, line 31; claim - *; | [Y]US5780768 (KNOWLTON GREGORY D [US], et al) [Y] 4 * column 11, line 13 - line 63 * * column 10, line 10 - line 16; claims 32-43 *; | [XY]DE29806504U (TRW AIRBAG SYS GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1,5-7,9,21 * claim - * [Y] 4,12-14; | [XY]DE29821541U (TRW AIRBAG SYS GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1,5-7,9,21 * claim - * [Y] 4,12-14; | [X]DE19840993 (TRW AIRBAG SYS GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1,5-7,21 * claim - * |