EP1345580 - COMPOSITION FOR OXIDATION DYEING OF KERATINOUS FIBRES COMPRISING A DIAMINO PYRAZOLE AND A CARBONYL COMPOUND [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 09.05.2014 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2014 | Deletion: Despatch of communication that patent is revoked | 09.05.2014 | New entry: Despatch of communication that patent is revoked | 09.05.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 11.06.2014 [2014/24] | 09.05.2014 | Revocation of patent | published on 11.06.2014 [2014/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'Oréal 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/39] | For all designated states L'OREAL 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COTTERET, Jean 13, rue du Pré Rousselin F-78480 Verneuil sur Seine / FR | [2003/39] | Representative(s) | Fevrier, Murielle Françoise E. L'Oréal Service DIPI 9 Rue Pierre Dreyfus 92110 Clichy / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/39] | Fevrier, Murielle L'Oreal, DPI, 6 Rue Bertrand Sincholle 92585 Clichy Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 01272054.6 | 26.11.2001 | [2003/39] | WO2001FR03729 | Priority number, date | FR20000016952 | 22.12.2000 Original published format: FR 0016952 | [2003/39] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02051373 | Date: | 04.07.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1345580 | Date: | 24.09.2003 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.07.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1345580 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/23] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP1345580 | Date: | 21.10.2009 | [2009/43] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP1345580 | Date: | 25.11.2009 | [2009/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61Q5/10, A61K8/35, A61K8/41 | [2006/23] | CPC: |
A61Q5/10 (EP,US);
A61K8/35 (EP,US);
A61K8/362 (EP,US);
A61K8/42 (EP,US);
A61K8/494 (EP,US);
A61K8/498 (EP,US);
A61K8/60 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2003/39] | A61K7/13 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/39] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OXIDATIONSHAARFÄRBEMITTEL ENTHALTEND EIN DIAMINOPYRAZOL UND EINE CARBONYL-VERBINDUNG | [2003/39] | English: | COMPOSITION FOR OXIDATION DYEING OF KERATINOUS FIBRES COMPRISING A DIAMINO PYRAZOLE AND A CARBONYL COMPOUND | [2003/39] | French: | COMPOSITION POUR LA TEINTURE D'OXYDATION DES FIBRES KERATINIQUES COMPRENANT UN DIAMINO PYRAZOLE ET UN COMPOSE CARBONYLE | [2003/39] | Entry into regional phase | 22.07.2003 | National basic fee paid | 22.07.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.07.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.07.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/39] | 22.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 31.03.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
21.02.2007
01.03.2007
ADMISSIBLE Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Patente (FJP) 40191 Düsseldorf / DE | 02
07.03.2007
19.04.2007
ADMISSIBLE The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US Opponent's representative Holmes, Rosalind, et al, et al Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Patent Department Berliner Allee 65 64274 Darmstadt / DE | [2013/17] |
Former [2008/51] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
21.02.2007
01.03.2007
ADMISSIBLE Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Patente (FJP) 40191 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
02
07.03.2007
19.04.2007
ADMISSIBLE The Procter and Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US Opponent's representative Kohol, Sonia, et al, et al Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Patent Department Rusham Park, Whitehall Lane Egham, Surrey TW20 9NW / GB | |||
Former [2007/15] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
21.02.2007
01.03.2007
ADMISSIBLE Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien VTP/Patente Henkelstrasse 67 40191 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
02
07.03.2007
The Procter and Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US Opponent's representative Kohol, Sonia, et al, et al Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Patent Department Rusham Park, Whitehall Lane Egham, Surrey TW20 9NW / GB | |||
Former [2007/13] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
21.02.2007
Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien VTP/Patente Henkelstrasse 67 40191 Düsseldorf / DE | deleted | Deletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ] | 24.04.2007 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 30.10.2007 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 06.05.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 26.06.2009 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 26.06.2009 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 23.04.2013 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [ N /P ] | 23.04.2013 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2014/24] | 23.07.2013 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Appeal following opposition | 26.08.2009 | Appeal received No. T1798/09 | 26.10.2009 | Statement of grounds filed | 23.04.2013 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 23.04.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 06.05.2013 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.06.2006 | CY | 07.06.2006 | FI | 07.06.2006 | IE | 07.06.2006 | NL | 07.06.2006 | TR | 07.06.2006 | DK | 07.09.2006 | SE | 07.09.2006 | GR | 08.09.2006 | PT | 07.11.2006 | LU | 26.11.2006 | BE | 30.11.2006 | CH | 30.11.2006 | LI | 30.11.2006 | MC | 30.11.2006 | GB | 26.11.2012 | IT | 26.11.2012 | ES | 27.11.2012 | FR | 30.11.2012 | [2014/24] |
Former [2013/51] | AT | 07.06.2006 | |
CY | 07.06.2006 | ||
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
IE | 07.06.2006 | ||
NL | 07.06.2006 | ||
TR | 07.06.2006 | ||
DK | 07.09.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
GR | 08.09.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
LU | 26.11.2006 | ||
BE | 30.11.2006 | ||
CH | 30.11.2006 | ||
LI | 30.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
GB | 26.11.2012 | ||
IT | 26.11.2012 | ||
FR | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 07.06.2006 | |
CY | 07.06.2006 | ||
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
IE | 07.06.2006 | ||
NL | 07.06.2006 | ||
TR | 07.06.2006 | ||
DK | 07.09.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
GR | 08.09.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
LU | 26.11.2006 | ||
BE | 30.11.2006 | ||
CH | 30.11.2006 | ||
LI | 30.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
IT | 26.11.2012 | ||
FR | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 07.06.2006 | |
CY | 07.06.2006 | ||
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
IE | 07.06.2006 | ||
NL | 07.06.2006 | ||
TR | 07.06.2006 | ||
DK | 07.09.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
GR | 08.09.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
LU | 26.11.2006 | ||
BE | 30.11.2006 | ||
CH | 30.11.2006 | ||
LI | 30.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
IT | 26.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 07.06.2006 | |
CY | 07.06.2006 | ||
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
IE | 07.06.2006 | ||
NL | 07.06.2006 | ||
TR | 07.06.2006 | ||
DK | 07.09.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
GR | 08.09.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
LU | 26.11.2006 | ||
BE | 30.11.2006 | ||
CH | 30.11.2006 | ||
LI | 30.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
IT | 26.11.2012 | ||
Former [2009/03] | AT | 07.06.2006 | |
CY | 07.06.2006 | ||
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
IE | 07.06.2006 | ||
NL | 07.06.2006 | ||
TR | 07.06.2006 | ||
DK | 07.09.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
GR | 08.09.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
LU | 26.11.2006 | ||
BE | 30.11.2006 | ||
CH | 30.11.2006 | ||
LI | 30.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/37] | AT | 07.06.2006 | |
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
IE | 07.06.2006 | ||
NL | 07.06.2006 | ||
TR | 07.06.2006 | ||
DK | 07.09.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
GR | 08.09.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
LU | 26.11.2006 | ||
BE | 30.11.2006 | ||
CH | 30.11.2006 | ||
LI | 30.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 07.06.2006 | |
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
IE | 07.06.2006 | ||
NL | 07.06.2006 | ||
DK | 07.09.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
GR | 08.09.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
BE | 30.11.2006 | ||
CH | 30.11.2006 | ||
LI | 30.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/50] | AT | 07.06.2006 | |
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
IE | 07.06.2006 | ||
NL | 07.06.2006 | ||
DK | 07.09.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
BE | 30.11.2006 | ||
CH | 30.11.2006 | ||
LI | 30.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/49] | AT | 07.06.2006 | |
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
IE | 07.06.2006 | ||
IT | 07.06.2006 | ||
NL | 07.06.2006 | ||
DK | 07.09.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
BE | 30.11.2006 | ||
CH | 30.11.2006 | ||
LI | 30.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/37] | AT | 07.06.2006 | |
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
IE | 07.06.2006 | ||
IT | 07.06.2006 | ||
NL | 07.06.2006 | ||
DK | 07.09.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
CH | 30.11.2006 | ||
LI | 30.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/36] | AT | 07.06.2006 | |
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
IE | 07.06.2006 | ||
IT | 07.06.2006 | ||
NL | 07.06.2006 | ||
DK | 07.09.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/25] | AT | 07.06.2006 | |
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
IE | 07.06.2006 | ||
NL | 07.06.2006 | ||
DK | 07.09.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | AT | 07.06.2006 | |
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
NL | 07.06.2006 | ||
DK | 07.09.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | AT | 07.06.2006 | |
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
NL | 07.06.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | AT | 07.06.2006 | |
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 07.06.2006 | |
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/51] | FI | 07.06.2006 | |
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | SE | 07.09.2006 | Cited in | International search | [DA]DE3843892 (WELLA AG [DE]) [DA] 1 * claim 1 *; | [DA]DE4234886 (WELLA AG [DE]) [DA] 1,27 * claims 1,9,14 *; | [A]US5718731 (LOEWE ISOLDE [DE], et al) [A] 1,2 * claim 1; table 1 *; | [A]EP0873745 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [A] 1,27* claims 1,9 *; | [A]WO0038640 (OREAL [FR], et al) [A] 1,27 * claims 7,14 * |