EP1345785 - FOLDING ROOF IN PARTICULAR FOR STATION WAGON, WITH PIVOTING AND SLIDING ELEMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.03.2007 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2009 | Change - representative | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Société Européenne de Brevets Automobiles - SEBA 127, rue Amelot 75011 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/23] | For all designated states Société Européenne de Brevets Automobiles - SEBA 127, Rue Amelot 75011 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2003/39] | For all designated states France Design Lieu-Dit La Boujalière 79140 Le Pin / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
QUEVEAU, Gérard "Amik Farm" F-79140 Le Pin / FR | 02 /
GUILLEZ, Jean-Marc "Les Maisons Blanches" F-79140 Cirières / FR | [2003/39] | Representative(s) | Geismar, Thierry NOVAGRAAF IP 122, rue Edouard Vaillant 92593 Levallois-Perret Cedex / FR | [2009/37] |
Former [2003/39] | Geismar, Thierry Bouju Derambure Bugnion, 52, rue de Monceau 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 01272056.1 | 05.12.2001 | [2003/39] | WO2001FR03845 | Priority number, date | FR20000017033 | 26.12.2000 Original published format: FR 0017033 | [2003/39] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02051659 | Date: | 04.07.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1345785 | Date: | 24.09.2003 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.07.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B60J7/02 | [2003/39] | CPC: |
B60J7/028 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB [2004/20] |
Former [2003/39] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | FALTDACH, INBESONDERE FÜR KOMBIWAGEN, MIT SCHWENK- UND GLEITELEMENTEN | [2003/39] | English: | FOLDING ROOF IN PARTICULAR FOR STATION WAGON, WITH PIVOTING AND SLIDING ELEMENTS | [2003/39] | French: | TOIT ESCAMOTABLE NOTAMMENT POUR VEHICULE DU TYPE BREAK, A ELEMENTS PIVOTANTS ET COULISSANTS | [2003/39] | Entry into regional phase | 22.04.2003 | National basic fee paid | 22.04.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.04.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.06.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/39] | 19.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/14] | 06.11.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2007/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2006 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE3903358 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 17 - column 5, line 31; figures 1-9 *; | [A]EP0835780 (KARMANN GMBH W [DE], et al) [A] 1* page 2, line 52 - page 3, line 49; figure 7 *; | [A]FR2783761 (FRANCE DESIGN [FR]) [A] 1-6 * page 3, line 15 - page 7, line 9; figures 1-9 * |