EP1345657 - ULTRASOUND ASSISTED LIPOLYSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.06.2005 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Insightec-Image Guided Treatment Ltd. P.O. Box 2059 39120 Tirat Hacarmel / IL | [2003/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRIEDMAN, Zvi 6 Ben Gurion Avenue 27 026 Kiryat Bialik / IL | 02 /
MAOR, Dov 18 Lea Goldberg Street 34 987 Haifa / IL | 03 /
VITEK, Shuki 33a Ilanot Street 34 324 Haifa / IL | [2003/39] | Representative(s) | Waxweiler, Jean, et al Dennemeyer & Associates S.A., P.O. Box 1502 1015 Luxembourg / LU | [N/P] |
Former [2003/39] | Waxweiler, Jean, et al Dennemeyer & Associates S.A., P.O. Box 1502 1015 Luxembourg / LU | Application number, filing date | 01272231.0 | 24.12.2001 | [2003/39] | WO2001IL01191 | Priority number, date | US20000753273 | 27.12.2000 Original published format: US 753273 | US20010879262 | 11.06.2001 Original published format: US 879262 | [2003/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02051501 | Date: | 04.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1345657 | Date: | 24.09.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.07.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1345657 | Date: | 11.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61N7/00 | [2003/39] | CPC: |
A61B17/22012 (EP,US);
A61B2017/22007 (EP,US);
A61N2007/0008 (EP,US);
A61N2007/0078 (EP,US);
A61N7/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/39] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ULTRASCHALLUNTERSTÜTZE LIPOLYSE | [2003/39] | English: | ULTRASOUND ASSISTED LIPOLYSIS | [2003/39] | French: | LIPOLYSE ULTRASONIQUE | [2003/39] | Entry into regional phase | 02.07.2003 | National basic fee paid | 02.07.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.07.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.07.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/39] | 19.11.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 01.06.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 04.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.05.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/31] | Request for further processing for: | 04.06.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 04.06.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.06.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.08.2004 | BE | 11.08.2004 | CH | 11.08.2004 | CY | 11.08.2004 | ES | 11.08.2004 | FI | 11.08.2004 | LI | 11.08.2004 | NL | 11.08.2004 | TR | 11.08.2004 | DK | 11.11.2004 | GR | 11.11.2004 | SE | 11.11.2004 | IE | 24.12.2004 | LU | 24.12.2004 | MC | 31.12.2004 | PT | 11.01.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/09] | AT | 11.08.2004 | |
BE | 11.08.2004 | ||
CH | 11.08.2004 | ||
CY | 11.08.2004 | ||
ES | 11.08.2004 | ||
FI | 11.08.2004 | ||
LI | 11.08.2004 | ||
NL | 11.08.2004 | ||
TR | 11.08.2004 | ||
DK | 11.11.2004 | ||
GR | 11.11.2004 | ||
SE | 11.11.2004 | ||
IE | 24.12.2004 | ||
LU | 24.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
Former [2006/51] | AT | 11.08.2004 | |
BE | 11.08.2004 | ||
CH | 11.08.2004 | ||
FI | 11.08.2004 | ||
LI | 11.08.2004 | ||
NL | 11.08.2004 | ||
TR | 11.08.2004 | ||
DK | 11.11.2004 | ||
GR | 11.11.2004 | ||
SE | 11.11.2004 | ||
IE | 24.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
Former [2006/23] | AT | 11.08.2004 | |
BE | 11.08.2004 | ||
CH | 11.08.2004 | ||
FI | 11.08.2004 | ||
LI | 11.08.2004 | ||
NL | 11.08.2004 | ||
DK | 11.11.2004 | ||
GR | 11.11.2004 | ||
SE | 11.11.2004 | ||
IE | 24.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 11.08.2004 | |
BE | 11.08.2004 | ||
CH | 11.08.2004 | ||
FI | 11.08.2004 | ||
LI | 11.08.2004 | ||
DK | 11.11.2004 | ||
GR | 11.11.2004 | ||
SE | 11.11.2004 | ||
IE | 24.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/45] | AT | 11.08.2004 | |
BE | 11.08.2004 | ||
CH | 11.08.2004 | ||
FI | 11.08.2004 | ||
LI | 11.08.2004 | ||
DK | 11.11.2004 | ||
GR | 11.11.2004 | ||
SE | 11.11.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/28] | AT | 11.08.2004 | |
BE | 11.08.2004 | ||
CH | 11.08.2004 | ||
FI | 11.08.2004 | ||
LI | 11.08.2004 | ||
DK | 11.11.2004 | ||
GR | 11.11.2004 | ||
SE | 11.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/22] | AT | 11.08.2004 | |
CH | 11.08.2004 | ||
FI | 11.08.2004 | ||
LI | 11.08.2004 | ||
DK | 11.11.2004 | ||
GR | 11.11.2004 | ||
SE | 11.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/21] | AT | 11.08.2004 | |
CH | 11.08.2004 | ||
FI | 11.08.2004 | ||
LI | 11.08.2004 | ||
GR | 11.11.2004 | ||
SE | 11.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 11.08.2004 | |
FI | 11.08.2004 | ||
GR | 11.11.2004 | ||
SE | 11.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/13] | AT | 11.08.2004 | |
FI | 11.08.2004 | ||
SE | 11.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 11.08.2004 | |
SE | 11.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/10] | SE | 11.11.2004 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5209221 (RIEDLINGER RAINER [DE]) [X] 1-3 * column 2, lines 22-46 * * column 3, lines 29-51 * * figure 1 *; | [X]EP0734742 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [X] 1,2,14 * column 12, lines 4-15 * * column 28, lines 10,11 * * column 31, lines 47-53 * * figures 20A,27; claims 1,2 *; | [A]US5938608 (BIEGER JOHANNES [DE], et al) [A] 6* claims 1,4 *; | [X]US6071239 (CRIBBS ROBERT W [US], et al) [X] 1,4,10-13 * column 5, lines 10-16,25-31,61-67 * * figures 5B,7,9; claim 3 *; | [X]US6113559 (KLOPOTEK PETER J [US]) [X] 1-12 * column 4, lines 3-20,57-62 * * column 5, lines 14,15,23-27 * * column 7, lines 1-15,46-55 * * column 8, lines 1,2,7-12 * * column 8, line 62 - column 9, line 2 * * figures 1,2,4,6,9; claim 7 * | by applicant | US5413063 | US5526814 | US5884631 |