EP1347083 - SILICON SINGLE CRYSTAL WAFER AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SILICON SINGLE CRYSTAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.07.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.11.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 17.12.2014 [2014/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Handotai Co., Ltd. 6-2, Ohtemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [2013/38] |
Former [2009/17] | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Handotai Co., Ltd. 6-2, Ohtemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2003/39] | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Handotai Co., Ltd 4-2 Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAKURADA, Masahiro, @c/o Shirakawa R & D Center 150, Aza Ohira Oaza Odakura Nishigo-mura Nishishirakawa-gun, Fukushima 961-8061 / JP | 02 /
KOBAYASHI, Takeshi, @c/o Shirakawa R & D Center 150, Aza Ohira Oaza Odakura Nishigo-mura Nishishirakawa-gun, Fukushima 961-8061 / JP | 03 /
MORI, Tatsuo, @c/o Shirakawa R & D Center 150, Aza Ohira Oaza Odakura Nishigo-mura Nishishirakawa-gun, Fukushima 961-8061 / JP | 04 /
FUSEGAWA, Izumi, @c/o Shirakawa R & D Center 150, Aza Ohira Oaza Odakura Nishigo-mura Nishishirakawa-gun, Fukushima 961-8061 / JP | 05 /
OHTA, Tomohiko, @c/o Shirakawa R & D Center 150, Aza Ohira Oaza Odakura Nishigo-mura Nishishirakawa-gun, Fukushima 961-8061 / JP | [2013/38] |
Former [2003/39] | 01 /
SAKURADA, Masahiro, c/o Shirakawa R & D Center 150, Aza Ohira, Oaza Odakura, Nishigo-mura Nishishirakawa-gun, Fukushima 961-8061 / JP | ||
02 /
KOBAYASHI, Takeshi, c/o Shirakawa R & D Center 150, Aza Ohira, Oaza Odakura, Nishigo-mura Nishishirakawa-gun, Fukushima 961-8061 / JP | |||
03 /
MORI, Tatsuo, c/o Shirakawa R & D Center 150, Aza Ohira, Oaza Odakura, Nishigo-mura Nishishirakawa-gun, Fukushima 961-8061 / JP | |||
04 /
FUSEGAWA, Izumi, c/o Shirakawa R & D Center 150, Aza Ohira, Oaza Odakura, Nishigo-mura Nishishirakawa-gun, Fukushima 961-8061 / JP | |||
05 /
OHTA, Tomohiko, c/o Shirakawa R & D Center 150, Aza Ohira, Oaza Odakura, Nishigo-mura Nishishirakawa-gun, Fukushima 961-8061 / JP | Representative(s) | Wibbelmann, Jobst, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/36] | Wibbelmann, Jobst, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/39] | Cooper, John, et al Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 01272882.0 | 26.12.2001 | [2003/39] | WO2001JP11492 | Priority number, date | JP20000403127 | 28.12.2000 Original published format: JP 2000403127 | [2003/39] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02053812 | Date: | 11.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1347083 | Date: | 24.09.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.07.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1347083 | Date: | 18.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.07.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C30B15/14, C30B29/06 | [2013/17] | CPC: |
C30B29/06 (EP,KR,US);
C30B15/14 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/39] | C30B29/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/22] |
Former [2003/39] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | SLIZIUMEINKRISTALLSCHEIBE UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR SILIZIUMEINKRISTALL | [2003/39] | English: | SILICON SINGLE CRYSTAL WAFER AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SILICON SINGLE CRYSTAL | [2003/39] | French: | PLAQUETTE DE SILICIUM MONOCRISTALLIN ET SON PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION | [2003/39] | Entry into regional phase | 31.08.2002 | Translation filed | 03.09.2002 | National basic fee paid | 03.09.2002 | Search fee paid | 03.09.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.09.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.09.2002 | Examination requested [2003/39] | 22.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.01.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.08.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 07.08.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.09.2009 | Opposition(s) | 19.06.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 01.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 07.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 19.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 18.09.2013 | GB | 26.12.2013 | [2014/51] |
Former [2014/38] | IT | 18.09.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0890662 (SHINETSU HANDOTAI KK [JP]) [X] 1-7 * page 4, lines 34-37; figures 7,8 *; | [X]US5954873 (HOURAI MASATAKA [JP], et al) [X] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0962556 (SHINETSU HANDOTAI KK [JP]) [X] 1-6* paragraphs [0011] , [0064] , [0107] *; | [E]EP1170404 (SHINETSU HANDOTAI KK [JP]) [E] 3-6 * paragraphs [0011] , [0012] *; | [E]WO03004734 (MEMC ELECTRONIC MATERIALS [US]) [E] 1-6 * claims 12,37,45 * | International search | [A]EP0964082 (SHINETSU HANDOTAI KK [JP]); | [X]US6048395 (IIDA MAKOTO [JP], et al); | [X]EP1035234 (SUMITOMO METAL IND [JP]) | by applicant | WO03004734 |