EP1374880 - AN ANTINEOPLASTIC DRUG [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.01.2007 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Li, Hongfen Room 902, 3th entrance, No.1 building, Lotus residential quarters Haidian District Beijing 100000 / CN | [2006/10] |
Former [2004/01] | For all designated states Li, Hongfen Room 902, 3th entrance, No.1 building, Lotus residential quarters Haidian District, Beijing 100000 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2004/01] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/01] | Goddar, Heinz J., Dr. FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01274051.0 | 01.11.2001 | [2004/01] | WO2001CN01521 | Priority number, date | IL20010135325 | 02.04.2001 Original published format: IL 13532501 | [2004/01] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02078722 | Date: | 10.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1374880 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.10.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1374880 | Date: | 08.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 10.10.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61K36/00, A61P35/00 | [2006/09] | CPC: |
A61K36/734 (EP,US);
A61K36/076 (EP,US);
A61K36/232 (EP,US);
A61K36/258 (EP,US);
A61K36/284 (EP,US);
A61K36/34 (EP,US);
A61K36/481 (EP,US);
A61K36/484 (EP,US);
A61K36/539 (EP,US);
A61K36/718 (EP,US);
A61K36/79 (EP,US);
A61K36/8968 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K36/076, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K36/232, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K36/258, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K36/284, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K36/34, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K36/481, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K36/484, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K36/539, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K36/718, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K36/734, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K36/79, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K36/8968, A61K2300/00 (EP,US); |
Former IPC [2004/17] | A61K35/78, A61P35/00 | ||
Former IPC [2004/01] | A61K35/78, A61K35/84, A61P35/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANTINEOPLASTISCHES ARZNEIMITTEL | [2004/01] | English: | AN ANTINEOPLASTIC DRUG | [2004/01] | French: | MEDICAMENT ANTINEOPLASIQUE | [2004/01] | Entry into regional phase | 01.10.2003 | Translation filed | 01.10.2003 | National basic fee paid | 01.10.2003 | Search fee paid | 01.10.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.10.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.06.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: CN | 01.10.2003 | Examination requested [2004/01] | 22.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.10.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.08.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.12.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 05.12.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.12.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2005 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   15.12.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.03.2006 | BE | 08.03.2006 | CY | 08.03.2006 | FI | 08.03.2006 | IT | 08.03.2006 | TR | 08.03.2006 | DK | 08.06.2006 | SE | 08.06.2006 | GR | 09.06.2006 | ES | 19.06.2006 | PT | 08.08.2006 | IE | 01.11.2006 | LU | 01.11.2006 | MC | 30.11.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
BE | 08.03.2006 | ||
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
IT | 08.03.2006 | ||
TR | 08.03.2006 | ||
DK | 08.06.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
GR | 09.06.2006 | ||
ES | 19.06.2006 | ||
PT | 08.08.2006 | ||
IE | 01.11.2006 | ||
LU | 01.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
BE | 08.03.2006 | ||
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
IT | 08.03.2006 | ||
DK | 08.06.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
GR | 09.06.2006 | ||
ES | 19.06.2006 | ||
PT | 08.08.2006 | ||
IE | 01.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/48] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
BE | 08.03.2006 | ||
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
IT | 08.03.2006 | ||
DK | 08.06.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
ES | 19.06.2006 | ||
PT | 08.08.2006 | ||
IE | 01.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/37] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
BE | 08.03.2006 | ||
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
IT | 08.03.2006 | ||
DK | 08.06.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
ES | 19.06.2006 | ||
PT | 08.08.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/36] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
BE | 08.03.2006 | ||
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
IT | 08.03.2006 | ||
DK | 08.06.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
ES | 19.06.2006 | ||
PT | 08.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
BE | 08.03.2006 | ||
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
DK | 08.06.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
ES | 19.06.2006 | ||
PT | 08.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/09] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
DK | 08.06.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
ES | 19.06.2006 | ||
PT | 08.08.2006 | ||
Former [2006/50] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
ES | 19.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/46] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/43] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | FI | 08.03.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5437866 (SUN ALEXANDER S [US]) [X] 1 * claims 1,4 * [A] 2-7; | [XA]US6071521 (KIM SONG BAE [KR]) [X] 1 * claim 1 *[A] 2-7 | International search | [A]CN1097621 (GUO WENFENG [CN]); | [A]CN1145240 (HUANG YINXIU [CN]); | [A]CN1157737 (ZHANG WENSHAN [CN]); | [A]CN1205880 (CHEN MING [CN]) | [A] - CHEN JIN, "Theory of eliminating the evil factors and restorating healthy energy in traditional Chinese medicine and research on anticancerous Chinese medicinal herb", TRADITIONAL CHINESE MEDICINE OF GUANG XI, (1985), vol. 8, no. 1, pages 47 - 49 |