EP1425217 - AERODYNAMIC BODY PROVIDED WITH SURFACE CAVITIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.07.2007 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2009 | Change - representative | published on 30.09.2009 [2009/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNIVERSITA' DEGLI STUDI DI ROMA "LA SAPIENZA" P.le Aldo Moro 5 00185 Roma / IT | [2006/36] |
Former [2004/24] | For all designated states UNIVERSITA' DEGLI STUDI DI ROMA "LA SAPIENZA" P.le Aldo Moro 5 00185 Roma / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GAMMA, Fausto Via Brentonico 58/4 00124 Roma / IT | 02 /
SCIUBBA, Enrico Via delle Najadi 17 I-00042 Anzio / IT | 03 /
ZINGARO, Domenico Piazza San Nicola, 1 I-86040 Macchia Valfortore (CB) / IT | [2006/36] |
Former [2004/32] | 01 /
GAMMA, Fausto Via dell'Orsa Maggiore, 99 I-00144 / IT | ||
02 /
SCIUBBA, Enrico Via delle Najadi 17 I-00042 Anzio / IT | |||
03 /
ZINGARO, Domenico Piazza San Nicola, 1 I-86040 Macchia Valfortore (CB) / IT | |||
Former [2004/27] | 01 /
GAMMA, Fausto Via dell'Orsa Maggiore, 99 I-00144 / IT | ||
02 /
SCIUBBA, Enrico Via XX Settembre, 44 I-00187 Roma / IT | |||
03 /
ZINGARO, Domenico Piazza San Nicola, 1 I-86040 Macchia Valfortore (CB) / IT | |||
Former [2004/24] | 01 /
GAMMA, Fausto Via dell'Orsa Maggiore, 99 I-00144 / IT | ||
02 /
SCIUBBA, Enrico Via XX Settembre, 44 I-00187 Roma / IT | |||
03 /
ZINGARO, Domenico Via Delle Acacie, 144 I-86040 Macchia Valfortore / IT | Representative(s) | Gervasi, Gemma Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Viale Achille Papa, 30 20149 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/40] | Gervasi, Gemma Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Corso di Porta Vittoria 9 20122 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2004/24] | Gervasi, Gemma, Dr. Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A., Corso di Porta Vittoria, 9 20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 01274423.1 | 04.12.2001 | [2004/24] | WO2001IB02295 | Priority number, date | IT2001RM00501 | 10.08.2001 Original published format: IT RM20010501 | [2004/24] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03013957 | Date: | 20.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1425217 | Date: | 09.06.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.02.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1425217 | Date: | 06.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B64C23/00, B64C21/02 | [2004/24] | CPC: |
B64C23/00 (EP);
B64C2230/06 (EP);
B64C2230/08 (EP);
B64C2230/20 (EP);
B64C2230/24 (EP);
Y02T50/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MIT OBERFLÄCHENKAVITÄTEN VERSEHENER AERODYNAMISCHER KÖRPER | [2004/24] | English: | AERODYNAMIC BODY PROVIDED WITH SURFACE CAVITIES | [2004/24] | French: | CORPS AERODYNAMIQUE PRESENTANT DES CAVITES DE SURFACE | [2004/24] | Entry into regional phase | 04.12.2001 | Translation filed | 10.03.2004 | National basic fee paid | 10.03.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.03.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/24] | 01.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 27.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.09.2006 | BE | 06.09.2006 | CH | 06.09.2006 | CY | 06.09.2006 | FI | 06.09.2006 | IT | 06.09.2006 | LI | 06.09.2006 | NL | 06.09.2006 | TR | 06.09.2006 | IE | 04.12.2006 | LU | 04.12.2006 | DK | 06.12.2006 | GR | 07.12.2006 | ES | 17.12.2006 | MC | 31.12.2006 | PT | 19.02.2007 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | AT | 06.09.2006 | |
BE | 06.09.2006 | ||
CH | 06.09.2006 | ||
FI | 06.09.2006 | ||
IT | 06.09.2006 | ||
LI | 06.09.2006 | ||
NL | 06.09.2006 | ||
TR | 06.09.2006 | ||
IE | 04.12.2006 | ||
LU | 04.12.2006 | ||
DK | 06.12.2006 | ||
GR | 07.12.2006 | ||
ES | 17.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
PT | 19.02.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 06.09.2006 | |
BE | 06.09.2006 | ||
CH | 06.09.2006 | ||
FI | 06.09.2006 | ||
IT | 06.09.2006 | ||
LI | 06.09.2006 | ||
NL | 06.09.2006 | ||
IE | 04.12.2006 | ||
DK | 06.12.2006 | ||
GR | 07.12.2006 | ||
ES | 17.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
PT | 19.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | AT | 06.09.2006 | |
BE | 06.09.2006 | ||
CH | 06.09.2006 | ||
FI | 06.09.2006 | ||
IT | 06.09.2006 | ||
LI | 06.09.2006 | ||
NL | 06.09.2006 | ||
IE | 04.12.2006 | ||
DK | 06.12.2006 | ||
ES | 17.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
PT | 19.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/37] | AT | 06.09.2006 | |
BE | 06.09.2006 | ||
CH | 06.09.2006 | ||
FI | 06.09.2006 | ||
IT | 06.09.2006 | ||
LI | 06.09.2006 | ||
NL | 06.09.2006 | ||
DK | 06.12.2006 | ||
ES | 17.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
PT | 19.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/36] | AT | 06.09.2006 | |
BE | 06.09.2006 | ||
CH | 06.09.2006 | ||
FI | 06.09.2006 | ||
IT | 06.09.2006 | ||
LI | 06.09.2006 | ||
NL | 06.09.2006 | ||
ES | 17.12.2006 | ||
PT | 19.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/28] | AT | 06.09.2006 | |
BE | 06.09.2006 | ||
CH | 06.09.2006 | ||
FI | 06.09.2006 | ||
LI | 06.09.2006 | ||
NL | 06.09.2006 | ||
ES | 17.12.2006 | ||
PT | 19.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/26] | CH | 06.09.2006 | |
FI | 06.09.2006 | ||
LI | 06.09.2006 | ||
NL | 06.09.2006 | ||
ES | 17.12.2006 | ||
PT | 19.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/19] | CH | 06.09.2006 | |
FI | 06.09.2006 | ||
LI | 06.09.2006 | ||
NL | 06.09.2006 | ||
ES | 17.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | CH | 06.09.2006 | |
FI | 06.09.2006 | ||
LI | 06.09.2006 | ||
ES | 17.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/09] | CH | 06.09.2006 | |
FI | 06.09.2006 | ||
LI | 06.09.2006 | Cited in | International search | [X]FR2051956 (BERTIN & CIE) [X] 1,5,6 * page 4, line 27 - line 31 * * figure 13 *; | [XY]US3774867 (QUINN B) [X] 1,5,7,8,11 * column 1, line 26 - line 29 * * column 1, line 52 - line 57 * * figures 2,3 * [Y] 2-4; | [YA]JP2000199505 (FUNAGATA KAGAKU KENKYUSHO KK) [Y] 2-4 [A] 1; | US6363972 [ ] (UMAZUME KOUSUKE [JP], et al) [ ] * figures 11,12 ** column 3, line 29 - line 38 * | Examination | US4619423 |