EP1434605 - PROCESS AND APPARATUS FOR IRRADIATING PRODUCT PALLETS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.08.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.09.2009 [2009/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ION BEAM APPLICATIONS S.A. Chemin du Cyclotron, 3 1348 Louvain-la-Neuve / BE | [2004/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROSE, Graham 8 Vermont Avenue Nepean, Ontario KG-6J6 / CA | 02 /
VANDER DONCKT, Muriel Rue A.Hottat 7 B-1050 Brussels / BE | 03 /
STICHELBAUT, Frédéric Rue de Saint-Martin 37 B-5032 Mazy / BE | 04 /
GREGOIRE, Olivier Rue des Laperteaux 231 B-7110 Maurage / BE | [2004/32] |
Former [2004/28] | 01 /
ROSE, Graham 8 Vermont Avenue Nepean, Ontario KG-6J6 / CA | ||
02 /
VANDER DONCKT, Muriel Rue Malibran 64 B-1050 Brussels / BE | |||
03 /
STICHELBAUT, Frédéric Rue du Moulin 7 B-1457 Walhain / BE | |||
04 /
GREGOIRE, Olivier Rue des Laperteaux 231 B-7110 Maurage / BE | Representative(s) | Van Malderen, Joëlle, et al pronovem - Office Van Malderen Avenue Josse Goffin 158 1082 Bruxelles / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/28] | Van Malderen, Joelle, et al Office Van Malderen, Place Reine Fabiola 6/1 1083 Bruxelles / BE | Application number, filing date | 01274517.0 | 03.12.2001 | [2004/28] | WO2001BE00204 | Priority number, date | EP20010870212 | 04.10.2001 Original published format: EP 01870212 | [2004/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03028771 | Date: | 10.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1434605 | Date: | 07.07.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.04.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61L2/08 | [2004/28] | CPC: |
A61L2/082 (EP,US);
A61L2/081 (EP,US);
G21K5/10 (EP,US);
A61L2202/122 (EP,US);
A61L2202/24 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/28] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND GERÄT ZUR BESTRAHLUNG VON PRODUKTPALETTEN | [2004/28] | English: | PROCESS AND APPARATUS FOR IRRADIATING PRODUCT PALLETS | [2004/28] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL D'IRRADIATION DE PALETTES DE PRODUITS | [2004/28] | Entry into regional phase | 18.03.2004 | National basic fee paid | 18.03.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.03.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.03.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/28] | 24.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.04.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/40] | 12.05.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2009/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 04.05.2004 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   18.05.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XD]US5396074 (PECK RICHARD O [US], et al) [XD] 1,2,4,6-8,20,28 * column 1, line 7 - column 2, line 63; claims 10,20,59,60 *; | [A]US6215847 (PERRINS ROB [CA], et al) [A] 20,22 * column 1, line 3 - line 28 * * column 13, line 56 - line 67; claim 28 *; | [A]EP0999556 (TITAN CORP [US]) [A] 20,22 * page 3, line 13 - line 22 * * page 10, line 25 - line 29; claim 1 * |