EP1455621 - COOKING UTENSIL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.06.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.2009 | Change - representative | published on 23.09.2009 [2009/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Berghoff Worldwide Boterbosstraat 6/1 3550 Heusden-Zolder / BE | [2004/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VANTHOOR, Rafael Weyerman 98 B-3550 Heusden-Zolder / BE | [2004/38] | Representative(s) | Luys, Marie-José A.H., et al Gevers Intellectual Property House Holidaystraat 5 1831 Diegem / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/39] | Luys, Marie-José A.H., et al Gevers & Vander Haeghen Intellectual Property House Holidaystraat 5 1831 Diegem / BE | ||
Former [2004/38] | Luys, Marie-José, et al Gevers & Vander Haeghen, Holidaystraat 5 1831 Diegem / BE | Application number, filing date | 01274731.7 | 09.11.2001 | [2004/38] | WO2001BE00194 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03043473 | Date: | 30.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1455621 | Date: | 15.09.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.05.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1455621 | Date: | 17.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A47J36/02 | [2004/38] | CPC: |
A47J36/02 (EP,US);
Y10S220/912 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/38] | Extension states | AL | 24.05.2004 | LT | 24.05.2004 | LV | 24.05.2004 | MK | 24.05.2004 | RO | 24.05.2004 | SI | 24.05.2004 | Title | German: | KOCHGERÄT | [2004/38] | English: | COOKING UTENSIL | [2004/38] | French: | USTENSILE DE CUISSON | [2004/38] | Entry into regional phase | 24.05.2004 | National basic fee paid | 24.05.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.05.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.05.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/38] | 07.10.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.12.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 06.12.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.05.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2004 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   26.05.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3045664 (DAVID LEVIN) [A] 1 * column 1, line 58 - column 2, line 33; figures 1,2 *; | [AD]US4350259 (CARTOSSI FERDINANDO) [AD] 1-6,8* column 4, lines 35-46; figures 5,6 *; | [A]US5647271 (CAPELLE JEAN-CLAUDE [FR], et al) [A] 1,2,4,7,8 * column 2, lines 31-64 * * column 4, lines 23-29 * * figures 1,4 * |